EP3086433 - CHARGING METHOD, ALTERNATING CURRENT ADAPTOR, CHARGING MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Dongping c/o ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jihong c/o ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 14880058.4 | 29.05.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014CN78807 | Priority number, date | CN20141026213 | 21.01.2014 Original published format: CN201410026213 | [2016/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015109718 | Date: | 30.07.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3086433 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
H02J7/00 (EP,CN,US);
H02M7/02 (CN);
H01M10/446 (CN);
H02J7/0045 (US);
H02J7/00045 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Title | German: | LADEVERFAHREN, WECHSELSTROMADAPTER, LADEMANAGEMENTVORRICHTUNG UND ENDVORRICHTUNG | [2016/43] | English: | CHARGING METHOD, ALTERNATING CURRENT ADAPTOR, CHARGING MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND TERMINAL | [2016/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CHARGE, ADAPTATEUR DE COURANT ALTERNATIF, DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE CHARGE ET TERMINAL | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2016 | Translation filed | 19.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 24.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011291609 (BAE SEUNG-MIN [KR]) [X] 1-5,12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2013190059 (SONG JIAN CHENG [CN], et al) [X] 1-5,12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2012210146 (LAI YI-LIN [TW], et al) [X] 1-5,12 * the whole document *; | [XI]CN102820682 (ZTE CORP) [X] 6-11,13 * the whole document * [I] 1; | [X]CN101674366 (HUIZHOU TCL MOBILE COMM CO LTD) [X] 6-11,13 * the whole document *; | [X]CN103064489 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD) [X] 6-11,13 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103208850 (HUIZHOU TCL MOBILE COMM CO LTD) [A] 1,6 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN201075704Y (QINGDAO HISENSE MOBILE COMM [CN]); | [X]CN101674366 (HUIZHOU TCL MOBILE COMM CO LTD); | [A]US2010201308 (LINDHOLM RUNE ADOLF [FI]); | [X]CN102820682 (ZTE CORP); | [X]CN103064489 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD); | [Y]CN103066340 (ZTE CORP); | [Y]WO2013097381 (ZTE CORP [CN], et al) |