EP3185478 - AUTOMATIC PACKET CAPTURE METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENG, Shenggen c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Lijuan c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/26] | Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 14881873.5 | 08.12.2014 | [2017/26] | WO2014CN93287 | Priority number, date | CN201410409011 | 19.08.2014 Original published format: CN201410409011 | [2017/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015117486 | Date: | 13.08.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3185478 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, H04L29/06, H04W24/00, H04L29/08 | [2017/34] | CPC: |
H04L65/1076 (EP);
H04L65/1023 (EP);
H04L65/103 (EP);
H04L65/1043 (EP);
H04L65/1083 (EP);
H04L67/51 (EP);
H04W24/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/26] | H04L12/26, H04L29/06, H04W24/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR AUTOMATISCHE PAKETVERFASSUNG | [2017/26] | English: | AUTOMATIC PACKET CAPTURE METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2017/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE CAPTURE AUTOMATIQUE DE PAQUETS | [2017/26] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2017 | Translation filed | 16.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/26] | 16.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02082729 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract ** page 20 - page 24; figures 6-7 *; | [X]WO2008086639 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 3 - page 7; figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO2012155773 (ZTE CORP [CN], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 2 - page 8; figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]CN1592235 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-13 * , see the whole document *; | [A]CN101406029 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-13 * , see the whole document *; | [A]CN101621429 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-13 * , see the whole document *; | [A]CN102694668 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-13 * , see the whole document *; | [A]JP2013138403 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-13* , see the whole document *; | [A]CN103516920 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-13 * , see the whole document * |