08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
10.07.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
08.05.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
10.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
31.05.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
24.05.2019 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
24.05.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.05.2019 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
04.05.2019 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
04.05.2019 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.05.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.05.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.12.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.12.2018 |
Change - English title |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
13.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.03.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
24.03.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] |
24.03.2017 |
Change - designated states |
published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] |
21.03.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.03.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.08.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
17.03.2015 |
Change - representative |
|