Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10119982 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2018 | B2 | US2016274137 | 22.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15159299 | 16.03.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6629103B | Global Dossier | 15.01.2020 | B2 | JP2016172643 | 29.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15159299 | 16.03.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105984728B | Global Dossier | 12.07.2019 | B | CN105984728 | 05.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15159299 | 16.03.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3070479 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2019 | B1 | EP3070479 | 21.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15159299 | 16.03.2015 |