EP2937349 - FUSED TRICYCLIC DUAL INHIBITORS OF CDK 4/6 AND FLT3 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMGEN INC. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Xiaoqi 970 Blair Court Palo Alto, CA California 94303 / US | 02 /
Dai, Kang 619 Santa Fe Avenue Albany, CA California 94706 / US | 03 /
Duquette, Jason A. 460 Bayview Avenue Millbrae, CA California 94030 / US | 04 /
Gribble, Michael W., Jr. 949 Capp Street, Apt 22 San Francisco, CA California 94110 / US | 05 /
Huard, Justin N. 8031 28th Ave NW Seattle, WA Washington 98117 / US | 06 /
Keegan, Kathleen S. 8264 NE Carmella Lane Bainbridge Island, WA Washington 98110 / US | 07 /
LI, Zhihong 467 Anita Drive Millbrae, CA California 94030 / US | 08 /
Lively, Sarah E. 1536 Eaton Avenue San Carlos, CA California 94070 / US | 09 /
McGee, Lawrence R. 39 Big Sur Way Pacifica, CA California 94044 / US | 10 /
Ragains, Mark L. 4129 S. Hulen Street, Apt. 822 Fort Worth, TX Texas 76109 / US | 11 /
Wang, Xianghong 4915 Shelton Street Dublin, CA California 94568 / US | 12 /
Weidner, Margaret F. 15726 160th Ave NE Woodinville, WA Washington 98072 / US | 13 /
Zhang, Jian 290 Pelican Court Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/44] | Application number, filing date | 15161337.9 | 21.03.2012 | [2015/44] | Priority number, date | US201161466841P | 23.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161466841 P | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2937349 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2937349 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/14, C07D519/00, A61K31/519, A61P35/00, A61P35/02 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
C07D519/00 (EP,CN,US);
C07D471/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] |
Former [2015/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FUSIONIERTE TRICYCLISCHE DUALE INHIBITOREN VON CDK 4/6 UND FLT3 | [2015/44] | English: | FUSED TRICYCLIC DUAL INHIBITORS OF CDK 4/6 AND FLT3 | [2015/44] | French: | DOUBLES INHIBITEURS TRICYCLIQUES FUSIONNÉS DE CDK 4/6 ET FLT3 | [2015/44] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 28.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12711738.0 / EP2688887 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.03.2012 | AL | 28.12.2016 | CY | 28.12.2016 | CZ | 28.12.2016 | EE | 28.12.2016 | HR | 28.12.2016 | LT | 28.12.2016 | LV | 28.12.2016 | MC | 28.12.2016 | MK | 28.12.2016 | PL | 28.12.2016 | RO | 28.12.2016 | RS | 28.12.2016 | SI | 28.12.2016 | SK | 28.12.2016 | SM | 28.12.2016 | LU | 21.03.2017 | MT | 21.03.2017 | BG | 28.03.2017 | GR | 29.03.2017 | IS | 28.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
MT | 21.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
MT | 21.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
MT | 21.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
MT | 21.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | HR | 28.12.2016 | |
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 28.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2009085185 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-14 * page 4; example 1; claims 1,4,7,44 *; | [AD]WO2009126584 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-14 * claims 1,36 * | by applicant | WO2009085185 | WO2009126584 | WO2007087276 | US6846630 | US4256108 | US4160452 | US4265874 | US6258812 | US2003105091 | WO0137820 | US6235764 | WO0132651 | US6630500 | US6515004 | US6713485 | US5521184 | US5770599 | US5747498 | WO02068406 | WO02066470 | WO02055501 | WO2004005279 | WO2004007481 | WO2004007458 | WO2004009784 | WO02059110 | WO9945009 | WO0059509 | WO9961422 | US5990141 | WO0012089 | WO0002871 | US2003162712 | US6413932 | US6727225 | US2002042368 | US5981245 | US5728813 | US5969110 | US6596852 | US6232447 | US6057124 | US5712291 | US5792783 | EP0970070 | JPH02233610 | EP0407122 | EP1813606 | - MORGAN, D. 0., ANNU. REV. CELL. DEV. BIOL., (1997), vol. 13, pages 261 - 291 | - DE CARCER, G. ET AL., CURR. MED. CHEM., (2007), vol. 14, pages 969 - 85 | - MALUMBRES, M. ET AL., NATURE REV. CANCER, (2001), vol. 1, pages 222 - 231 | - KAMB, A., CURR. TOP. MICROBIOLO. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 227, pages 139 - 148 | - CHANG, M. W. ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1995), vol. 96, page 2260 | - YANG, Z-Y. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA, (1996), vol. 93, page 9905 | - BROOKS, E. E. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 29207 - 29211 | - BUKANOV, N. O. ET AL., NATURE, (2006), vol. 4444, pages 949 - 952 | - SCHANG, L. M. ET AL., J. VIROL., (1998), vol. 72, page 5626 | - TANIGUCHI, K. ET AL., NAT. MED., (1999), vol. 5, pages 760 - 767 | - CHEN ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER INSTITUTE, (2000), vol. 92, pages 1999 - 2008 | - SCHMIDT, M, ONCOGENE, (2001), vol. 20, pages 6164 - 71 | - SATYANARAYANA, A. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2009), vol. 28, pages 2925 - 39 | - MALUMBRES, M ET AL., CELL, (2004), vol. 118, pages 493 - 504 | - MALUMBRES, M ET AL., NATURE REV. CANCER, (2001), vol. 1, pages 222 - 31 | - YU, Q. ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2006), vol. 9, pages 3 - 32 | - PUYOL, M., CANCER CELL, (2010), vol. 18, pages 63 - 73 | - NAOFUMI, M. ET AL., LEUKEMIA RES., (2005), vol. 29, pages 557 - 64 | - DREXLER, H. G., LEUKEMIA, (1998), vol. 12, pages 845 - 59 | - HERMAN, J. G. ET AL., CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 57, pages 837 - 41 | - SCHOLL C. ET AL., SEMIN. ONCOL., (2008), vol. 35, pages 336 - 45 | - MESHINCHI S. ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2009), vol. 15, pages 4263 - 9 | - MACKAREHTSCHIAN K ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1995), vol. 3, pages 147 - 61 | - YAMAMOTO ET AL., BLOOD, (2001), vol. 97, no. 8, pages 2434 - 2439 | - JIANG, J. ET AL., BLOOD, (2004), vol. 104, no. 6, pages 1855 - 1858 | - KINDLER ET AL., BLOOD, (2005), vol. 105, no. 1, pages 335 - 340 | - REINDEL ET AL., BLOOD, (2006), vol. 107, no. 9, pages 3700 - 3707 | - KELLY ET AL., BLOOD, (2002), vol. 99, pages 310 - 318 | - WEISBERG, E. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2010), vol. 29, pages 5120 - 34 | - CHU, S. H ET AL., DRUG RESIST. UPDATE, (2009), vol. 12, pages 8 - 16 | - HEIDEL, F. ET AL., BLOOD, (2006), vol. 107, pages 293 - 300 | - PRATZ, K. W. ET AL., BLOOD, (2009), vol. 139, pages 3938 - 46 | - TAM, W. F. ET AL., BEST PRACT. RES. CLIN. HAEMATOL., (2008), vol. 21, pages 13 - 20 | - WILEN, S. H. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1997), vol. 33, page 2725 | - WILEN, S. H., Tables of Resolving Agents and Optical Resolutions, UNIV. OF NOTRE DAME PRESS, (1972), page 268 | - MATSUNO ET AL., "p15 mRNA expression detected by real-time quantitative reverse transcriptase-polymerase chain reaction correlates with the methylation density of the gene in adult acute leukemia", LEUKEMIA RES., (2005), vol. 29, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.leukres.2004.11.003, pages 557 - 564, XP004774320 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.leukres.2004.11.003 | - DE JONGE ET AL., "AML at older age: age related gene expression profiles reveal a paradoxical down-regulation of P16INK4A mRNA with prognostic significance", BLOOD, (2012), vol. 114, no. 14, pages 2869 - 2877 |