EP2957638 - PESTICIDAL PROTEINS AND METHODS FOR THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Agricultural Solutions Seed US LLC 100 Park Avenue Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | [2019/11] |
Former [2015/52] | For all designated states Athenix Corporation 3500 Paramount Parkway Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMPSON, Kimberley, S. 5505 Frenchman's Creek Drive Durham, NC 27713 / US | 02 /
TOMSO, Daniel, J. 114 Vista Del Rio Drive Bahama, NC 27503 / US | 03 /
DUMITRU, Razvan, Valeriu 422 Cosgrove Avenue Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/50] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2015/52] | Power, David J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15176499.0 | 26.02.2010 | [2015/52] | Priority number, date | US20090156301P | 27.02.2009 Original published format: US 156301 P | [2015/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2957638 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2957638 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C07K14/325, A01N63/02 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
C12N15/8286 (EP,US);
A01N63/50 (EP,US);
C07K14/325 (EP,US);
Y02A40/146 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N63/50, A01N63/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] |
Former [2015/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | 22.06.2016 | BA | 22.06.2016 | RS | 22.06.2016 | Title | German: | PESTIZIDE PROTEINE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2015/52] | English: | PESTICIDAL PROTEINS AND METHODS FOR THEIR USE | [2015/52] | French: | PROTÉINES INSECTICIDES ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION DE CELLES-CI | [2015/52] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 01.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 28.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.06.2018 | 19.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10706110.3 / EP2401380 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 28.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.10.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2010 | AT | 12.12.2018 | CY | 12.12.2018 | CZ | 12.12.2018 | DK | 12.12.2018 | EE | 12.12.2018 | ES | 12.12.2018 | FI | 12.12.2018 | HR | 12.12.2018 | IT | 12.12.2018 | LT | 12.12.2018 | LV | 12.12.2018 | MC | 12.12.2018 | MK | 12.12.2018 | NL | 12.12.2018 | PL | 12.12.2018 | RO | 12.12.2018 | SE | 12.12.2018 | SI | 12.12.2018 | SK | 12.12.2018 | SM | 12.12.2018 | TR | 12.12.2018 | IE | 26.02.2019 | LU | 26.02.2019 | MT | 26.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | FR | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | BG | 12.03.2019 | GB | 12.03.2019 | NO | 12.03.2019 | GR | 13.03.2019 | IS | 12.04.2019 | PT | 12.04.2019 | DE | 03.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 26.02.2010 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IE | 26.02.2019 | ||
LU | 26.02.2019 | ||
MT | 26.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GB | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
DE | 03.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IE | 26.02.2019 | ||
LU | 26.02.2019 | ||
MT | 26.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GB | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
DE | 03.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IE | 26.02.2019 | ||
LU | 26.02.2019 | ||
MT | 26.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GB | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
DE | 03.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IE | 26.02.2019 | ||
LU | 26.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GB | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
DE | 03.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
IE | 26.02.2019 | ||
LU | 26.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GB | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
DE | 03.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
IE | 26.02.2019 | ||
LU | 26.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
DE | 03.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 12.12.2018 | |
NO | 12.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5356623 (VON TERSCH MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-12 *; | [A]WO9924581 (MYCOGEN CORP [US]) [A] 1-14* claims 1,14 *; | [A]US2005049410 (CAROZZI NADINE [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0053] , [0093] , [0111]; claims 1-23; sequences 1,2 *; | [Y]WO2005107383 (MONSANTO TECHNOLOGY LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * examples 1-7; sequence 31 *; | [Y]WO2006083891 (ATHENIX CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 37, lines 7-17; claims 1-26; sequence 4 *; | [A] - SONG F ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF CRY1I-TYPE GENES FROM BACILLUS THURINGIENSIS STRAINS AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A NOVEL CRY1I-TYPE GENE", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1128/AEM.69.9.5207-5211.2003, (20030901), vol. 69, no. 9, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 5207 - 5211, XP002325394 [A] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.69.9.5207-5211.2003 | by applicant | US4196265 | US4945050 | WO9100915 | US5039523 | EP0462721 | EP0480762 | US5240842 | US5380831 | US5436391 | US5605793 | US5723758 | US5743477 | US5770696 | US5837458 | WO0066742 | US6232439 | WO0138514 | US2001026941 | US2002115066 | US6468523 | US2004014091 | US7105332 | - CRICKMORE ET AL., MICROBIOL. MOL. BIOL. REV., (1998), vol. 62, pages 807 - 813 | - HOFTE; WHITELEY, MICROBIOL. REV., (1989), vol. 53, pages 242 - 255 | - DE MAAGD ET AL., TRENDS GENETICS, (2001), vol. 17, pages 193 - 199 | - BARTH ET AL., MICROBIOL MOL BIOL REV, (2004), vol. 68, pages 373 - 402 | - FERRE; VAN RIE, ANNU. REV. ENTOMOL., (2002), vol. 47, pages 501 - 533 | - CRICKMORE ET AL., BACILLUS THURINGIENSIS TOXIN NOMENCLATURE, (2003), URL: www.biols.susx.ac.uk/Home/Neil_Crickmore/Bt/index | - LI ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 353, page 815 821 | - CHOI ET AL., CURR. MICROBIOL., (2000), vol. 41, pages 65 - 69 | - GLEAVE ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1993), vol. 59, pages 1683 - 1687 | - KOSTICHKA ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1996), vol. 178, pages 2141 - 2144 | - SELVAPANDIYAN ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2001), vol. 67, pages 5855 - 5858 | - SHIN ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 61, pages 2402 - 2407 | - SONG ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2003), vol. 69, pages 5207 - 5211 | - TAILOR ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (1992), vol. 6, pages 1211 - 1217 | - TOUNSI ET AL., J. APPL. MICROBIOL., (2003), vol. 95, pages 23 - 28 | - LAGNAOUI ET AL., CIP PROGRAM REP., (2001), pages 117 - 121 | - LIU ET AL., ACTA BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. SIN., (2004), vol. 36, pages 309 - 313 | - SELVAPANDIYAN ET AL., MOL. BREED., (1998), vol. 4, pages 473 - 478 | - ANGSUTHANASOMBAT ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 37, no. 3, pages 304 - 313 | - WEI, PROC.NATL.ACAD.SCI. USA, (2003), vol. 100, no. 5, pages 2760 - 2765 | - ELLIS ET AL., APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL., (2002), vol. 68, pages 1137 - 45 | - BAUM ET AL., APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL., (2004), vol. 70, pages 4889 - 98 | - BAUMANN ET AL., MICRIOBIOL. REV., (1991), vol. 55, pages 425 - 36 | - BAUMANN ET AL., MICROBIOL. REV., (1991), vol. 55, pages 425 - 436 | - LIU ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1996), vol. 62, pages 2174 - 2176 | - WIRTH ET AL., APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (2007), vol. 73, no. 19, pages 6066 - 6071 | - HEINZ ET AL., EMBO J., (1995), vol. 14, pages 3855 - 3863 | - GASSIER ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 36, pages 12802 - 12813 | - RANG ET AL., CURR MICROBIOL., (2000), vol. 40, no. 3, pages 200 - 4 | - CZAPLA; LANG, J. ECON. ENTOMOL., (1990), vol. 83, pages 2480 - 2485 | - ANDREWS ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (1988), vol. 252, pages 199 - 206 | - MARRONE ET AL., J. OF ECONOMIC ENTOMOLOGY, (1985), vol. 78, pages 290 - 293 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, page 2264 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5877 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, page 403 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, page 3389 | - HIGGINS ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 4673 - 4680 | - MYERS; MILLER, CABIOS, (1988), vol. 4, pages 11 - 17 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, no. 3, pages 443 - 453 | - MAAGD ET AL., TRENDS GENETICS, (2001), vol. 17, pages 193 - 199 | - MEINKOTH; WAHL, ANAL. BIOCHEM, (1984), vol. 138, pages 267 - 284 | - SCHNEPF ET AL., MICROBIOL. MOL. BIOL. REV., (1998), vol. 62, pages 775 - 806 | - STEMMER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 10747 - 10751 | - STEMMER, NATURE, (1994), vol. 370, pages 389 - 391 | - CRAMERI ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH., (1997), vol. 15, pages 436 - 438 | - MOORE ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 272, pages 336 - 347 | - ZHANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 4504 - 4509 | - CRAMERI ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, pages 288 - 291 | - NAIMOV ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2001), vol. 67, pages 5328 - 5330 | - DE MAAGD ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1996), vol. 62, pages 1537 - 1543 | - GE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, pages 17954 - 17958 | - SCHNEPF ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, pages 20923 - 20930 | - RANG ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1999), vol. 65, pages 2918 - 2925 | - HELLENS; MULLINEAUX, TRENDS IN PLANT SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 5, pages 446 - 451 | - GUERINEAU ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1991), vol. 262, pages 141 - 144 | - PROUDFOOT, CELL, (1991), vol. 64, pages 671 - 674 | - SANFACON ET AL., GENES DEV., (1991), vol. 5, pages 141 - 149 | - MOGEN ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1990), vol. 2, pages 1261 - 1272 | - MUNROE ET AL., GENE, (1990), vol. 91, pages 151 - 158 | - BALLAS ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 7891 - 7903 | - JOSHI ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1987), vol. 15, pages 9627 - 9639 | - CAMPBELL; GOWRI, PLANT PHYSIOL., (1990), vol. 92, pages 1 - 11 | - MURRAY ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 477 - 498 | - VON HEIJNE ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL. REP., (1991), vol. 9, pages 104 - 126 | - CLARK ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, pages 17544 - 17550 | - DELLA-CIOPPA ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1987), vol. 84, pages 965 - 968 | - ROMER ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1993), vol. 196, pages 1414 - 1421 | - SHAH ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 233, pages 478 - 481 | - HIEI ET AL., THE PLANT JOURNAL, (1994), vol. 6, pages 271 - 282 | - ISHIDA ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, pages 745 - 750 | - AYRES; PARK, CRITICAL REVIEWS IN PLANT SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 13, pages 219 - 239 | - BOMMINENI; JAUHAR, MAYDICA, (1997), vol. 42, pages 107 - 120 | - SVAB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 8526 - 8530 | - SVAB; MALIGA, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 913 - 917 | - SVAB; MALIGA, EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, pages 601 - 606 | - MCBRIDE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 7301 - 7305 | - MCCORMICK ET AL., PLANT CELL REPORTS, (1986), vol. 5, pages 81 - 84 | - STALKER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1985), vol. 263, pages 6310 - 6314 | - SATHASIVAN ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, page 2188 | - MILLER ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (2001), vol. 127, pages 594 - 606 |