EP2977472 - TEMPERING STATION FOR TEMPERING OF SHEET METAL CIRCUIT BOARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH An der Talle 27-31 33102 Paderborn / DE | [2016/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trippe, Carsten Hedwig-Dransfeld-Weg 18 33154 Salzkotten / DE | 02 /
Wulfes, Dieter Eichenweg 41 33178 Borchen / DE | 03 /
Adelbert, Stefan Im Hofe 1 33129 Delbrück / DE | 04 /
Danger, Elisabeth Vossberg 42 33100 Paderborn / DE | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Griepenstroh, Jörg, et al Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [2016/04] | Application number, filing date | 15184535.1 | 18.09.2013 | [2016/04] | Priority number, date | DE201210110649 | 07.11.2012 Original published format: DE102012110649 | [2016/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2977472 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2977472 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C21D7/13, B21D35/00, C21D11/00, C21D1/18, C21D1/673, B21J1/06, C21D9/46, B21D22/02, C21D8/00, C21D1/34, C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/12, C22C38/14 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
B21D22/022 (EP,US);
C21D1/18 (EP,US);
C21D1/185 (EP,US);
C21D1/34 (EP,US);
C21D1/40 (EP,US);
C21D1/42 (EP,US);
C21D1/673 (EP,US);
C21D8/00 (EP,US);
C21D8/005 (EP,US);
C21D9/0062 (EP,US);
C21D9/46 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/12 (EP,US);
C22C38/14 (EP,US);
C22C38/44 (EP,US);
C22C38/48 (EP,US);
C22C38/50 (EP,US);
C22C38/54 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] | Title | German: | TEMPERIERSTATION ZUR TEMPERIERUNG VON BLECHPLATINEN | [2016/04] | English: | TEMPERING STATION FOR TEMPERING OF SHEET METAL CIRCUIT BOARDS | [2016/04] | French: | STATION DE CHAUFFAGE DE PLATINES EN TOLE | [2016/04] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 08.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2016 | Observations by third parties | 29.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13184929.1 / EP2730665 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2013 | AL | 02.11.2016 | CY | 02.11.2016 | DK | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | FI | 02.11.2016 | HR | 02.11.2016 | IT | 02.11.2016 | LT | 02.11.2016 | LV | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | MK | 02.11.2016 | MT | 02.11.2016 | NL | 02.11.2016 | RO | 02.11.2016 | RS | 02.11.2016 | SI | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | SM | 02.11.2016 | TR | 02.11.2016 | BG | 02.02.2017 | NO | 02.02.2017 | GR | 03.02.2017 | IS | 02.03.2017 | PT | 02.03.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
MT | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
TR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
MT | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MT | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.09.2013 | |
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MT | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 02.11.2016 | |
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MT | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | DK | 02.11.2016 | |
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | DK | 02.11.2016 | |
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | DK | 02.11.2016 | |
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | DK | 02.11.2016 | |
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | DK | 02.11.2016 | |
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 02.11.2016 | |
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | FI | 02.11.2016 | |
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 02.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2182082 (NEUE MATERIALIEN BAYREUTH GMBH [DE]) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraphs [0036] , [ 0040] , [ 0041] *; | [AD]DE102010004081 (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-6 * page 6, paragraph 0009; claim 1 *; | [I]EP2182081 (NEUE MATERIALIEN BAYREUTH GMBH [DE]) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraphs [0036] , [ 0042] , [ 0043] *; | [A]EP2014777 (NEUE MATERIALIEN BAYREUTH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0006] , [ 0012] , [ 0014] , [ 0017] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraphs [0032] , [ 0042] , [ 0054] *; | [AD]DE102010048209 (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-6 * paragraphs [0008] , [ 0011] , [ 0015] - paragraphs [0017] , [ 0027] * | by applicant | DE102010004081 |