EP3018144 - PRLR-SPECIFIC ANTIBODY AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 13.04.2018 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | 13.04.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XOMA Technology Ltd. 2910 Seventh Street Berkeley CA 94701 / US | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2016/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEDINGER, Daniel 451 Robin Circle Vacaville, CA 95687 / US | 02 /
DAMIANO, Jason Novartis AG Intellectual Property R-338 P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | 03 /
LUQMAN, Mohammad Novartis AG Intellectual Property R-338 P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | 04 /
MASAT, Linda 2728 San Antonio Drive Walnut Creek, CA 94598 / US | 05 /
MIRZA, Amer 271 6th Avenue, Apt. 13 San Francisco, CA 94118 / US | 06 /
NONET, Genevieve 739 Grizzley Peak Blvd. Berkeley, CA 94708 / US | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/19] | Application number, filing date | 15186855.1 | 17.08.2007 | [2016/19] | Priority number, date | US20060838648P | 18.08.2006 Original published format: US 838648 P | US20070946360P | 26.06.2007 Original published format: US 946360 P | [2016/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3018144 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, C12N5/18, C12N15/13, A61K31/00 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
C07K16/2869 (EP,US);
C07K16/28 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K39/3955 (EP,US);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/6851 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/30 (US);
G01N33/53 (KR);
G01N33/5308 (US);
G01N33/57492 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,US);
C07K2317/732 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/51] |
Former [2016/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 09.11.2016 | BA | 09.11.2016 | HR | 09.11.2016 | MK | 09.11.2016 | RS | 09.11.2016 | Title | German: | PRLR-SPEZIFISCHER ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2016/19] | English: | PRLR-SPECIFIC ANTIBODY AND USES THEREOF | [2016/19] | French: | ANTICORPS PRLR SPÉCIFIQUE ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2016/19] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 26.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/20] | 12.04.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.04.2018 | 16.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07814191.8 / EP2059535 | EP11190591.5 / EP2423231 | Divisional application(s) | EP18166185.1 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005068503 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al)[A] 1-17; | [XI] - "Monoclonal Anti-human Prolactin R Antibody", (20050606), INTERNET CITATION, URL: http://www.rndsystems.com/pdf/MAB1167.pdf, (20080505), XP002479170 [X] 1-5,9-13 * the whole document * [I] 6-8,14-17 | [XI] - HU ZHANG-ZHI ET AL, "Isolation and characterization of two novel forms of the human prolactin receptor generated by alternative splicing of a newly identified exon 11", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20011102), vol. 276, no. 44, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 41086 - 41094, XP002479171 [X] 1-5,9-13 * page 41087, column R, paragraph 1 * * figures 3,8,9,11 * [I] 6-8,14-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M102109200 | [T] - "Prolactin Receptor", INTERNET CITATION, URL: http://www.bioreagents.com/products/productDetails/productDetails.cfm?catnbr=MA1-610, (20080505), XP002479172 | [XDI] - SISSOM J F ET AL, "ANTI-GROWTH ACTION ON MOUSE MAMMARY AND PROSTATE GLANDS OF A MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY TO PROLACTIN RECEPTOR", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (19881201), vol. 133, no. 3, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 589 - 595, XP008068076 [XD] 1-6,9-14 * the whole document * [I] 7,8,15-17 | [XI] - OKAMURA H ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION AND APPLICATIONS OF MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES TO THE PROLACTIN RECEPTOR", ENDOCRINOLOGY, ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, US, (19890101), vol. 124, no. 4, ISSN 0013-7227, pages 2499 - 2508, XP009099845 [X] 1-5,9-13 * the whole document * [I] 6-8,14-17 | [A] - DAVIES J ET AL, "Affinity improvement of single antibody VH domains: residues in all three hypervariable regions affect antigen binding", IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, NL, (19960901), vol. 2, no. 3, ISSN 1380-2933, pages 169 - 179, XP004070292 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1380-2933(96)00045-0 | [A] - HOLT L J ET AL, "Domain antibodies: proteins for therapy", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20031101), vol. 21, no. 11, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 484 - 490, XP004467495 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2003.08.007 | [A] - MCKAY BROWN ET AL, "Tolerance to single, but not multiple, amino acid replacements in antibody V-H CDR2: A means of minimizing B cell wastage from somatic hypermutation?", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (19960101), vol. 156, no. 9, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 3285 - 3291, XP002649029 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | by applicant | US30985 | US3773919 | US4179337 | EP0023940 | WO8101145 | US4301144 | EP0073657 | US4419446 | EP0120694 | EP0125023 | US4485045 | US4495285 | US4496689 | US4544545 | US4560655 | EP0171496 | EP0173494 | WO8601533 | EP0183070 | US4601978 | US4609546 | EP0194276 | WO8700195 | US4640835 | US4657866 | US4670417 | US4675187 | US4676980 | WO8705330 | EP0244234 | US4766106 | US4767704 | WO8807378 | US4791192 | US4816567 | DD266710 | EP0315456 | US4837028 | US4892538 | WO9003430 | US4927762 | WO9007861 | US4965199 | WO9013646 | US4975278 | EP0402226 | EP0404097 | US5013556 | US5019369 | WO9109967 | WO9110741 | US5057313 | WO9117271 | WO9201047 | US5122469 | WO9211018 | WO9311161 | WO9311266 | US5229275 | WO9319172 | WO9325673 | US5283187 | WO9402602 | WO9411026 | WO9515388 | US5443953 | US5530101 | US5545807 | WO9627011 | WO9630498 | US5565332 | WO9632478 | US5567610 | WO9633735 | WO9634096 | US5573905 | US5585089 | US5589369 | US5591669 | US5624821 | WO9734631 | US5693762 | WO9824893 | US5766886 | US5766866 | US5770429 | US5877293 | US5892019 | US5939598 | WO9958572 | US6054287 | US6194551 | WO0143869 | US6306393 | US2002004215 | US2002091240 | WO02092780 | US6489145 | US2002199213 | US2003028071 | US2003031667 | US2003032995 | US2003044772 | US2003092125 | WO03041600 | US2003118592 | US2003133939 | US6605449 | US2003190317 | US2003194404 | WO2004033693 | US6737056 | US2004132101 | US2005037421 | US2005136049 | US2006121604 | - BOUTIN, J.- M. ET AL., MOLEC. ENDOCR., (1989), vol. 3, pages 1455 - 1461 | - ARDEN, K. C. ET AL., CYTOGENET. CELL GENE, (1990), vol. 53, pages 161 - 165 | - ARDEN, K.C. ET AL., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1989), vol. 45, no. A129 | - HU, Z.-Z. ET AL., J. CLIN. ENDOCR. METAB., (1999), vol. 84, pages 1153 - 1156 | - LING, C. ET AL., J. CLIN. ENDOCR. METAB., (2003), vol. 88, pages 1804 - 1808 | - PERROT-APPLANAT, M. ET AL., MOLEC. ENDOCR., (1997), vol. 11, pages 1020 - 1032 | - LI ET AL., CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 64, pages 4774 - 4782 | - GILL ET AL., J CLIN PATHOL., (2001), vol. 54, pages 956 - 960 | - TOURAINE ET AL., J CLIN ENDOCRINOL METAB., (1998), vol. 83, pages 667 - 674 | - TWOROGER ET AL., CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 64, pages 6814 - 6819 | - TWOROGER ET AL., CANCER RES., (2006), vol. 66, pages 2476 - 2482 | - WENNBO ET AL., J CLIN INVEST., (1997), vol. 100, pages 2744 - 2751 | - WENNBO ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1997), vol. 138, pages 4410 - 4415 | - SISSOM ET AL., AM. J. PATHOL., (1988), vol. 133, pages 589 - 595 | - XU ET AL., CANCER RES., (2001), vol. 61, pages 6098 - 6104 | - SCATCHARD ET AL., ANN N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1949), vol. 51, page 660 | - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - ROTH, D.B.; CRAIG, N.L., CELL, (1998), vol. 94, pages 411 - 414 | - ZAPATA ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (1995), vol. 8, no. 10, pages 1057 - 1062 | - PLUCKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 1 13, pages 269 - 315 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL.BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - GODING, Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Practice, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1986), pages 59 - 103 | - KOZBOR, J. IMMUNOL., (1984), vol. 133, page 3001 | - BRODEUR ET AL., Monoclonal Antibody Production Techniques and Applications, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1987), pages 51 - 63 | - MUNSON ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 107, page 220 | - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Guide, COLD SPRING HARBOR PRESS, (1989), vol. 1-3 | - CATON; KOPROWSKI, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 6450 - 6454 | - SANGER, F. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1977), vol. 74, pages 5463 - 5467 | - National Center for Biotechnology Information, National Library of Medicine, ATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH | - 30 HOLLINGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - ZAPATA ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (1995), vol. 8, pages 1057 - 62 | - OLAFSEN ET AL., PROTEIN ENG DES SEL., (200404), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 315 - 23 | - GREENBERG ET AL., NATURE, (1995), vol. 374, pages 168 - 73 | - NUTTALL ET AL., MOL IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 38, pages 313 - 26 | - HAMERS-CASTERMAN ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 363, pages 446 - 8 | - NGUYEN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 275, page 413 | - REICHMAN ET AL., J IMMUNOL METHODS, (1999), vol. 231, pages 25 - 38 | - DESMYTER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 26285 - 90 | - EWERT ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 41, pages 3628 - 36 | - CORTEZ-RETAMOZO ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 64, pages 2853 - 57 | - CONRATH ET AL., ANTIMICROB AGENTS CHEMOTHER, (2001), vol. 45, pages 2807 - 12 | - BIOCCA ET AL., EMBO J., (1990), vol. 9, pages 101 - 108 | - COLBY ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (2004), vol. 101, pages 17616 - 21 | - MHASHILKAR ET AL., EMBO J, (1995), vol. 14, pages 1542 - 51 | - WHEELER ET AL., FASEB J., (2003), vol. 17, pages 1733 - 5 | - HENG ET AL., MED HYPOTHESES., (2005), vol. 64, pages 1105 - 8 | - BRENNAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 81 | - BETTER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1041 - 1043 | - SKERRA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1038 - 1041 | - CARTER ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 163 - 167 | - SHALABY ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1992), vol. 175, pages 217 - 225 | - KOSTELNY ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, no. 5, pages 1547 - 1553 | - HOLLINGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - GRUBER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, page 5368 | - TUTT ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, page 60 | - NERI ET AL., J MOL BIOL., (1995), vol. 246, pages 367 - 73 | - SCHOONJANS ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 165, pages 7050 - 57 | - WILLEMS ET AL., J CHROMATOGR B ANALYT TECHNOL BIOMED LIFE SCI., (2003), vol. 786, pages 161 - 76 | - MORIMOTO ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL METHODS, (1992), vol. 24, pages 107 - 117 | - STINCHCOMB ET AL., NATURE, (1979), vol. 282, page 39 | - JONES, GENETICS, (1977), vol. 85, page 12 | - K. LACTIS; VAN DEN BERG, BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, page 135 | - FLEER ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 968 - 975 | - REYES ET AL., NATURE, (1982), vol. 297, pages 598 - 601 | - YANIV, NATURE, (1982), vol. 297, pages 17 - 18 | - URLAUB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4216 | - GRAHAM ET AL., J. GEN VIROL., (1977), vol. 36, page 59 | - MATHER, BIOL. REPROD., (1980), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251 | - MATHER ET AL., Annals N.Y Acad. Sci., (1982), vol. 383, pages 44 - 68 | - HAM ET AL., METH. ENZ., (1979), vol. 58, page 44 | - BARNES ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 102, page 255 | - ICSU SHORT REPORTS, (1990), vol. 10, page 105 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 457 - 461 | - CARTER ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 163 - 167 | - LINDMARK ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METH, (1983), vol. 62, pages 1 - 13 | - GUSS ET AL., EMBO J., (1986), vol. 5, pages 1567 - 1575 | - MORRISON, S. L. ET AL., "Chimeric Human Antibody Molecules; Mouse Antigen Binding Domains with Human Constant Region Domains", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6841 - 6855 | - BOULIANNE, G. L. ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 312, pages 643 - 646 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., U.S.A., (1984), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855 | - MORRISON; OI, ADV. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 44, pages 65 - 92 | - VERHOEYER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - PADLAN, MOLEC. IMMUN., (1991), vol. 28, pages 489 - 498 | - PADLAN, MOLEC. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 169 - 217 | - KETTLEBOROUGH, C.A. ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (1991), vol. 4, no. 7, pages 773 - 83 | - RIECHMANN, L. ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, page 323 | - CO, M. S. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, pages 2968 - 2976 | - STUDNICKA ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1994), vol. 7, pages 805 - 814 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, page 2551 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258 | - BRUGGERMANN ET AL., YEAR IN IMMUNO., (1993), vol. 7, page 33 | - FISHWILD ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 14, pages 845 - 851 | - ISHIDA ET AL., CLONING STEM CELLS., (2002), vol. 4, pages 91 - 102 | - JESPERS, L. S. ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 12, pages 899 - 903 | - HOOGENBOOM ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 227, page 381 | - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL, (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - CLACKSON, T.; WELLS, J. A., TIBTECH, (1994), vol. 12, pages 173 - 184 | - BURTON, D. R.; BARBAS III, C. F., ADV. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 57, pages 191 - 280 | - WINTER, G. ET AL., ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 12, pages 433 - 455 | - WATKINS, "Screening of Phage-Expressed Antibody Libraries by Capture Lift", METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ANTIBODY PHAGE DISPLAY: METHODS AND PROTOCOLS, vol. 178, pages 187 - 193 | - DAYHOFF ET AL., Atlas of Protein Sequence and Structure, (1978), vol. 5 | - FIELD ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1988), vol. 8, pages 2159 - 2165 | - EVAN ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1985), vol. 5, no. 12, pages 3610 - 3616 | - PABORSKY ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1990), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 547 - 553 | - LOW ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 260, pages 359 - 68 | - NISHIMIYA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, pages 12813 - 20 | - CHOWDHURY, P. S., METHODS MOL. BIOL., (2002), vol. 178, pages 269 - 85 | - RAJPAL ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (2005), vol. 102, pages 8466 - 71 | - HULS ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL IMMUNOTHER., (2001), vol. 50, pages 163 - 71 | - DAUGHERTY ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (2000), vol. 97, pages 2029 - 34 | - RAJPAL ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (2005), vol. 102, pages 8466 - 71 | - ZACCOLO ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 285, pages 775 - 783 | - HAWKINS ET AL., J MOL BIOL., (1992), vol. 226, pages 889 - 96 | - STEMMER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 10747 - 51 | - CUNNINGHAM; WELLS, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - CARON ET AL., J. EXP MED., (1992), vol. 176, pages 1191 - 1195 | - SHOPES, B., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 2918 - 2922 | - WOLFF ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 53, pages 2560 - 2565 | - STEVENSON ET AL., ANTI-CANCER DRUG DESIGN, (1989), vol. 3, pages 219 - 230 | - STEPLEWSKI ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1988), vol. 85, no. 13, pages 4852 - 6 | - MOLEC. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 29, no. 5, pages 633 - 9 | - SHIELDS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, no. 9, pages 6591 - 6604 | - PRESTA ET AL., BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS., (2001), vol. 30, pages 487 - 490 | - CHAPPEL ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1991), vol. 88, no. 20, pages 9036 - 40 | - ISAACS ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 161, no. 8, pages 3862 - 9 | - ARMOUR ET AL., MOL IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 40, no. 9, pages 585 - 93 | - XU ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, no. 5, pages 3469 - 74 | - SCHUURMAN ET AL., MOL IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 38, no. 1, pages 1 - 8 | - ANGAL ET AL., MOL IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 30, no. 1, pages 105 - 8 | - YAMANE-OHNUKI ET AL., BIOTECHNOL BIOENG., (20040905), vol. 87, no. 5, pages 614 - 22 | - ROTHMAN ET AL., MOL IMMUNOL., (198912), vol. 26, no. 12, pages 1113 - 23 | - SHIELDS ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (20020726), vol. 277, no. 30, pages 26733 - 40 | - SHINKAWA ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (20030131), vol. 278, no. 5, pages 3466 - 73 | - UMANA ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL., (199902), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 176 - 80 | - T. E. CREIGHTON, Proteins: Structure and Molecular Properties, W.H. FREEMAN & CO., (1983), pages 79 - 86 | - APLIN; WRISTON, CRC CRIT. REV. BIOCHEM., (1981), pages 259 - 306 | - HAKIMUDDIN ET AL., ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1987), vol. 259, page 52 | - EDGE ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1981), vol. 118, page 131 | - THOTAKURA ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 138, page 350 | - FELGNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 7413 - 7417 | - MALONE ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 6077 - 6081 | - ITO ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1990), vol. 1023, pages 124 - 132 | - J. P. BEHR, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1986), vol. 27, pages 5861 - 5864 | - J. P. BEHR ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 6982 - 6986 | - LEVENTIS ET AL., BIOCHIM. INTER., (1990), vol. 22, pages 235 - 241 | - GAO ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1991), vol. 1065, pages 8 - 14 | - BEHR ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM, (1994), vol. 5, pages 382 - 389 | - ZHOU ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1991), vol. 939, pages 8 - 18 | - BALLAS ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1988), vol. 939, pages 8 - 18 | - PINNADUWAGE ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1989), vol. 985, pages 33 - 37 | - ROSE ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUE, (1991), vol. 10, pages 520 - 525 | - OHMORI N I ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (19970627), vol. 235, no. 3, pages 726 - 9 | - POLLARD H ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1998), vol. 273, no. 13, pages 7507 - 11 | - LETSINGER, R. L., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1989), vol. 86, no. 17, pages 6553 - 6 | - FRIEDMANN, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1275 - 1281 | - ANDERSON, NATURE, (1998), vol. 392, no. 6679, pages 25 - 30 | - VERMA, SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, (1990), pages 68 - 84 | - MILLER, NATURE, (1992), vol. 357, pages 455 - 460 | - CHAMPE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 1388 - 1394 | - WILMAN, "Prodrugs in Cancer Chemotherapy", BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS, (1986), vol. 14, pages 375 - 382 | - "Prodrugs: A Chemical Approach to Targeted Drug Delivery", STELLA ET AL., Directed Drug Delivery, HUMANA PRESS, (1985), pages 247 - 267 | - EPSTEIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 3688 | - HWANG ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4030 | - MARTIN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1982), vol. 257, pages 286 - 288 | - GABIZON ET AL., J. NATIONAL CANCER INST., (1989), vol. 81, no. 19, page 1484 | - STERNBERGER, L.A. ET AL., J. HISTOCHEM. CYTOCHEM., (1970), vol. 18, page 315 | - BAYER, E.A. ET AL., METH. ENZYM., (1979), vol. 62, page 308 | - ENGVAL, E. ET AL., IMMUNOL., (1972), vol. 109, page 129 | - GODING, J.W., J. IMMUNOL. METH., (1976), vol. 13, page 215 | - SHIH ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1988), vol. 41, pages 832 - 839 | - SHIH ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1990), vol. 46, pages 1101 - 1106 | - YU ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1994), vol. 56, page 244 | - "Modification of Antibodies by Chemical Methods", UPESLACIS ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Applications, WILEY-LISS, INC., (1995), pages 187 - 230 | - "Production and Characterization of Synthetic Peptide-Derived Antibodies", PRICE ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies: Production, Enineering and Clinical Application, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1995), pages 60 - 84 | - BOLETI ET AL., ANN. ONCOL., (1995), vol. 6, page 945 | - NICOLET ET AL., CANCER GENE THER., (1995), vol. 2, page 161 | - BECKER ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, page 7826 | - HANK ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (1996), vol. 2, page 1951 | - HU ET AL., CANCER RES., (1996), vol. 56, page 4998 | - VITETTA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 238, page 1098 | - LEUNG ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 154, page 5919 | - YANG ET AL., HUM. ANTIBODIES HYBRIDOMAS, (1995), vol. 6, page 129 | - CHAUDHARY ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 339, page 394 | - BRINKMANN ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, page 8616 | - BATRA ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, page 5867 | - FRIEDMAN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 150, page 3054 | - WELS ET AL., INT. J. CAN., (1995), vol. 60, page 137 | - FOMINAYA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, page 10560 | - KUAN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 35, page 2872 | - SCHMIDT ET AL., INT. J. CAN., (1996), vol. 65, page 538 | - KREITMAN ET AL., LEUKEMIA, (1993), vol. 7, page 553 | - NICHOLLS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, page 5302 | - THOMPSON ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, page 28037 | - VALLERA ET AL., BLOOD, (1996), vol. 88, page 2342 | - DEONARAIN ET AL., TUMOR TARGETING, (1995), vol. 1, page 177 | - LINARDOU ET AL., CELL BIOPHYS., (1994), vol. 24-25, page 243 | - DOHLSTEN ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, page 8945 | - PASTAN ET AL., CELL, (1986), vol. 47, page 641 | - GOLDENBERG, CA, A CANCER JOURNAL FOR CLINICIANS, (1994), vol. 44, page 43 | - MASSEY, NATURE, (1987), vol. 328, pages 457 - 458 | - NEUBERGER ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 312, pages 604 - 608 | - ZOLA, Monoclonal Antibodies: A Manual of Techniques, CRC PRESS, INC., (1987), pages 147 - 158 | - MARKS ET AL., METHODS MOL BIOL., (2004), vol. 248, pages 161 - 76 | - METHODS MOL BIOL., (2004), vol. 248, pages 161 - 76 | - SWARTZMAN ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM., (1999), vol. 271, pages 143 - 51 | - FREDERICKS ET AL., PROTEIN ENG DES SEL., (200401), vol. 1 7, no. 1, pages 95 - 106 | - POWERS ET AL., J IMMUNOL METHODS, (20010501), vol. 251, no. 1-2, pages 123 - 35 | - SHU ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 7995 - 7998 | - KABAT, J. IMMUNOL., (1980), vol. 125, pages 961 - 969 |