EP3153808 - A COOLING APPARATUS AND A MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology Oy Valimopolku 4 A 00380 Helsinki / FI | [2017/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Habert, Mathieu ABB Switzerland Ltd, Corporate Research Segelhofstrasse 1 K 5405 Baden-Daettwil / CH | 02 /
Agostini, Bruno ABB Switzerland Ltd, Corporate Research Segelhofstrasse 1 K 5405 Baden-Daettwil / CH | 03 /
Torresin, Daniele ABB Switzerland Ltd, Corporate Research Segelhofstrasse 1 K 5405 Baden-Daettwil / CH | 04 /
Agostini, Francesco ABB Switzerland Ltd, Corporate Research Segelhofstrasse 1 K 5405 Baden-Daettwil / CH | 05 /
Riedel, Gernot ABB Switzerland Ltd, Corporate Research Segelhofstrasse 1K 5405 Baden-Daettwil / CH | 06 /
Leppänen, Veli-Matti c/o ABB Oy Strömbergintie 1 00380 Helsinki / FI | [2017/15] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2017/15] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 15188764.3 | 07.10.2015 | [2017/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3153808 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/02, F28D15/02, F28D15/04, F28F1/02, H05K7/20 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
F28F1/022 (EP);
F28D15/0233 (EP);
F28D15/0266 (EP);
F28D15/0275 (EP);
F28D15/04 (EP);
F28F9/02 (EP);
H05K7/20336 (EP);
F28F21/084 (EP);
F28F2255/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLVORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2017/15] | English: | A COOLING APPARATUS AND A MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2017/15] | French: | APPAREIL DE REFROIDISSEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2017/15] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/17] | 04.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009211743 (SCHRADER TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [X] 11,12,14 * paragraphs [0044] - [0060] - [ 0078] - [0082] - paragraph [0060]; figures 1-10, 16A-17B *; | [Y]EP2444770 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]JP2003166793 (FUJINE SANGYO KK) [Y] 1-11 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2014202474 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al) [Y] 7 * page 4, line 15 - page 12, line 10; figures 16-20 *; | [A]EP2811251 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP2327947 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-9 *; | [A]EP2793261 (ABB OY [FI]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2006042825 (LU MINHUA [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0076]; figures 5-13B *; | [A]US2013194745 (MEIJER INGMAR G [CH], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0022] , [ 0025]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5704415 (SUZUKI MASAMICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 54; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2012087088 (KILLION JESSE DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0093] , [ 0204]; figures 7-7B *; | [A]US2010032150 (DETERMAN MATTHEW [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055]; figures 10,11 *; | [A]JP2005201600 (FUJINE SANGYO KK) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]JP2004020093 (FUJINE SANGYO KK) [A] 1-16 * abstract * |