Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] |
03.12.2017 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.10.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.09.2017 | Change - representative | |
10.03.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
07.10.2015 | Change - representative |