blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3165618

EP3165618 - CRUCIBLE SKIMMING, STIRRING AND SAMPLE TAKING STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  16.10.2020
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.04.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.08.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 24.08.2022  [2022/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Befesa Aluminio, S.L.
Carretera Luchana Asúa n°13
48950 Erandio, BIZKAIA / ES
[2017/19]
Inventor(s)01 / ARTOLA CAREAGA, JOSE MARIA
Carretera Luchana-Asua, 13
48930 ERANDIO (Bizkaia) / ES
 [2017/19]
Representative(s)Clarke, Modet y Cía., S.L.
C/ Suero de Quiñones 34-36
28002 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2017/19]Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al
Clarke, Modet & Co.
Suero de Quiñones, 34-36
28002 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date15382539.303.11.2015
[2017/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3165618
Date:10.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3165618
Date:01.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2016
ClassificationIPC:C22B21/06, B22D43/00
[2017/19]
CPC:
B22D43/007 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/38]
Former [2017/19]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:TIEGEL-ENTSCHLACKUNGS-, RÜHR- UND PROBENNAHMESTATION[2017/19]
English:CRUCIBLE SKIMMING, STIRRING AND SAMPLE TAKING STATION[2017/19]
French:STATION POUR ÉCRÉMER, AGITER ET PRÉLÈVEMENT D'ÉCHANTILLON DANS UN CREUSET[2017/19]
Examination procedure03.11.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.08.2017Examination requested  [2017/38]
16.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2018Fee for grant paid
20.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.05.2019  09.05.2019  ADMISSIBLE
STAS Inc.
1846 Outarde
Chicoutimi QC G7K 1H1 / CA
Opponent's representative
Fleuchaus, Andrea
Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechsanwälte
Steinerstraße 15/Haus A
81369 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2019/46]
Opponent(s)01  02.05.2019  09.05.2019  ADMISSIBLE
STAS Inc.
1846 Outarde
Chicoutimi QC G7K 1H1 / CA
Opponent's representative
Fleuchaus, Andrea
Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinerstraße 15/Haus A
81369 München / DE
Former [2019/24]
Opponent(s)01  02.05.2019  09.05.2019  ADMISSIBLE
STAS Inc.
1846 Outarde
Chicoutimi QC G7K 1H1 / CA
Opponent's representative
Wu, Sau Ming Samuel
Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Steinerstraße 15/A
81369 München / DE
14.05.2019Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
23.06.2020Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/47]
02.07.2020Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.07.2020Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.11.2015
AL01.08.2018
CY01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
GR01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
MK01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
PT01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
TR01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
IE03.11.2018
LU03.11.2018
MT03.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
GB03.11.2019
IT03.11.2019
ES04.11.2019
FR30.11.2019
DE03.06.2020
[2022/34]
Former [2020/48]HU03.11.2015
AL01.08.2018
CY01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
GR01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
MK01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
PT01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
TR01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
IE03.11.2018
LU03.11.2018
MT03.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
GB03.11.2019
IT03.11.2019
FR30.11.2019
DE03.06.2020
Former [2020/31]HU03.11.2015
AL01.08.2018
CY01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
GR01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
MK01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
PT01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
TR01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
IE03.11.2018
LU03.11.2018
MT03.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2020/30]AL01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
GR01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
PT01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
TR01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
IE03.11.2018
LU03.11.2018
MT03.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2020/28]AL01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
PT01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
TR01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
IE03.11.2018
LU03.11.2018
MT03.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2020/16]AL01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
TR01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
IE03.11.2018
LU03.11.2018
MT03.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2020/08]AL01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
IE03.11.2018
LU03.11.2018
MT03.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/51]AL01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
IE03.11.2018
LU03.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/48]AL01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
IE03.11.2018
LU03.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/40]AL01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
LU03.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AL01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
LU03.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/34]AL01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
LU03.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/33]AL01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/24]AL01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT01.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US6375712  (FORBERG HELGE O [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 18 - column 13, line 25 * * figures 1-11 *;
 [A]US5536295  (SLOVICH CHARLES M [US]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-6 * * column 1, line 52 - column 5, line 30 *;
 [A]EP1623778  (MECCANO SYSTEM S R L [IT]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 1-8 *;
 [A]EP2626685  (SIEMENS VAI METALS TECH GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0034] *;
 [A]WO0226421  (OUTOKUMPU OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN204198829U  (GEORG FISCHER AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS SUZHOU CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - GARIEPY B ET AL, "THE TAC PROCESS: A PROVEN TECHNOLOGY. THE TAC PROCESS: A PROVEN TECHNOLOGY", JOURNAL OF METALS, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NEW YORK, (19841101), vol. 36, no. 11, ISSN 0148-6608, pages 40 - 43, XP002016599 [A] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SCHNEIDER W, "REINIGUNG VON ALUMINIUMSCHMELZEN", GIESSEREI,, (19940725), vol. 81, no. 14, ISSN 0016-9765, pages 478 - 483, XP000457409 [A] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [A]  - "|FEN UND EINRICHTUNGEN F}R DIE NE-METALL-INDUSTRIE., ANNOUNCEMENT", MAN BERICHTEN, OBERHAUSEN, DE, (19880101), no. 88543, pages 1 - 04, XP000123365 [A] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SZEKELY A G, "DAS SNIF-VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON VERUNREINIGUNGEN AUS ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGEN", ERZMETALL, GMBD - MEDIENVERLAG, CLAUSTHAL-ZELLERFELD, DE, (19780301), vol. 31, no. 3, ISSN 0044-2658, pages 110 - 117, XP000560600 [A] 1-5 * the whole document *
OppositionUS6375712
 US5536295
 EP1623778
 EP2626685
 WO2008124840
 DE102009051145
 JP2011033315
 EP1798007
 WO2010060475
    - "ARMS Systems", lnductotherm Corp., (20150524), pages 1 - 3, URL: https://web.archive.org, XP055589228
    - Haugen et al., "Crucible fluxing with Hycast? RAM - effect on metal quality and operational cost.", Materials Science Forum, (20110700), vol. 693, pages 44 - 53, XP055589232
    - "Smelter Trending & Handling - Simulation & Photos video and description", Robotic Automation P/L, (20150218), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=TqYUXpMWP2M, XP054979394
    - "Operational experience with a large capacity integrated TAC (treatment of aluminium in a crucible) and a skimmer", Light Metals 2009, (20090000), pages 755 - 760, XP055589243
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.