Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9464375 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2016 | B2 | US2015211170 | 30.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514594192 | 12.01.2015 | US201461931028 | 24.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017507692 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US12404 | 22.01.2015 | US201461931028 | 24.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105934188B | Global Dossier | 21.02.2020 | B | CN105934188 | 07.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US12404 | 22.01.2015 | US201461931028 | 24.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3096670 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2020 | B1 | EP3096670 | 30.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US12404 | 22.01.2015 | US201461931028 | 24.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2935410 | 30.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US12404 | 22.01.2015 | US201461931028 | 24.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2016009535 | 17.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US12404 | 22.01.2015 | US201461931028 | 24.01.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015112682 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461931028 | 24.01.2014 |