EP3107836 - COFFEE CAPSULE WITH ELECTRICAL CONDUCTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ritter GmbH Kaufbeurer Strasse 55 86830 Schwabmünchen / DE | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINIS, Frank Döllgaststrasse 10 86199 Augsburg / DE | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Lermer, Christoph Nove Haus - Design Offices Luise-Ullrich-Straße 14 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | Lermer, Christoph LermerRaible Patent- u. Rechtsanwalts PartGmbB Lessingstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15709853.4 | 17.02.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015EP53291 | Priority number, date | DE201410101964 | 17.02.2014 Original published format: DE102014101964 | DE201410101965 | 17.02.2014 Original published format: DE102014101965 | [2016/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015121491 | Date: | 20.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3107836 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/804 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
B65D85/8043 (EP,US);
B65D65/466 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Title | German: | KAFFEEKAPSEL MIT ELEKTRISCHER LEITFÄHIGKEIT | [2016/52] | English: | COFFEE CAPSULE WITH ELECTRICAL CONDUCTIVITY | [2016/52] | French: | CAPSULE DE CAFÉ À CONDUCTIVITÉ ÉLECTRIQUE | [2016/52] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 10.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/20] | 11.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002015768 (MASEK PETR [CH], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2218653 (WONS UWE [CH]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2218652 (WONS UWE [CH]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011015973 (ETHICAL COFFEE COMPANY SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-25* the whole document *; | [XA]WO2013053655 (GOGLIO SPA [IT]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [A] 2,4-25; | [XA]US2013099597 (PERENTES ALEXANDRE [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,11 * the whole document * [A] 2,4-10,12-25; | [XI]WO2013120997 (RITTER GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-21,23-25 * the whole document * [I] 2,22; | [A]US2013243911 (ABEGGLEN DANIEL [CH], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO2014005873 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [A] 2,4-25 |