EP3120224 - SELECTION USING EYE GAZE EVALUATION OVER TIME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMSBY, Scott c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
AMBRUS, Tony c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
SCAVEZZE, Michael c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
LEE, Abby Lin c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
MOUNT, Brian c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
MCINTYRE, Ian Douglas c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 07 /
BURNS, Aaron Mackay c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 08 /
MCMACKIN, Russ c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 09 /
DORAN, Katelyn Elizabeth c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 10 /
SCHNEIDER, Gerhard c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 11 /
MILLER, Quentin Simon Charles c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/26] | Free, Rachel Alder, et al CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | ||
Former [2017/04] | Free, Rachel Alder, et al Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 15716214.0 | 18.03.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015US21121 | Priority number, date | US201414221147 | 20.03.2014 Original published format: US201414221147 | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015142966 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3120224 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3120224 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/048, G06F3/0482, G06K9/00, G06F3/0484 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
G06F3/04842 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/013 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/048 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/04883 (US);
G06V40/19 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSWAHL MITTELS BLICKVERFOLGUNGSAUSWERTUNG IM LAUFE DER ZEIT | [2017/04] | English: | SELECTION USING EYE GAZE EVALUATION OVER TIME | [2017/04] | French: | SÉLECTION UTILISANT UNE ÉVALUATION DU REGARD AU FIL DU TEMPS | [2017/04] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 19.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2015 | AL | 28.06.2017 | AT | 28.06.2017 | CY | 28.06.2017 | CZ | 28.06.2017 | DK | 28.06.2017 | EE | 28.06.2017 | ES | 28.06.2017 | FI | 28.06.2017 | HR | 28.06.2017 | IT | 28.06.2017 | LT | 28.06.2017 | LV | 28.06.2017 | MC | 28.06.2017 | MK | 28.06.2017 | PL | 28.06.2017 | PT | 28.06.2017 | RO | 28.06.2017 | RS | 28.06.2017 | SE | 28.06.2017 | SI | 28.06.2017 | SK | 28.06.2017 | SM | 28.06.2017 | TR | 28.06.2017 | BG | 28.09.2017 | NO | 28.09.2017 | GR | 29.09.2017 | IS | 28.10.2017 | IE | 18.03.2018 | LU | 18.03.2018 | MT | 18.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 18.03.2015 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 18.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
MT | 18.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 18.03.2015 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 18.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
MT | 18.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 18.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
MT | 18.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 18.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
MT | 18.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 18.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
MT | 18.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 18.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4836670 (HUTCHINSON THOMAS E [US]) [X] 1,3,6-8 * abstract * * column 5, line 35 - line 54 * * column 18, line 42 - column 19, line 28; figure 12 * [I] 4,5,9,10; | [A]US2005243054 (BEYMER DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [XI]US2007040799 (SINGH MONA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraph [0023]; figure 1A * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035]; figure 3 * [I] 10; | [XI]US2012173999 (INVERNIZZI PAOLO [IT]) [X] 1,5,6 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0049]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0055]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0077]; figures 7-10 * [I] 2,10; | [A]WO2013082760 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * page 14, line 27 - page 15, line 47; figure 7 *; | [A]US2013196757 (LATTA STEPHEN [US], et al) [A] 10* paragraph [0023]; figures 1,2 * | Examination | - YANXIA ZHANG ET AL, "SideWays", HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 NEW YORK NY 10121-0701 USA, (20130427), doi:10.1145/2470654.2470775, ISBN 978-1-4503-1899-0, pages 851 - 860, XP058016310 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2470654.2470775 |