Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10275095 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2019 | B2 | US2017075499 | 16.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP58643 | 22.04.2015 | EP14167942 | 12.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170008760 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP58643 | 22.04.2015 | EP14167942 | 12.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6609269B | Global Dossier | 20.11.2019 | B2 | JP2017515777 | 15.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP58643 | 22.04.2015 | EP14167942 | 12.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106458711 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP58643 | 22.04.2015 | EP14167942 | 12.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3142976 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2018 | B1 | EP3142976 | 22.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP58643 | 22.04.2015 | EP14167942 | 12.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2675557T | 11.07.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP58643 | 22.04.2015 | EP14167942 | 12.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3142976T | 28.09.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP58643 | 22.04.2015 | EP15717495 | 22.04.2015 | EP14167942 | 12.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015172983 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14167942 | 12.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE038106T | 28.09.2018 | T2 | Priority number | Date | EP14167942 | 12.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR201809184T | 23.07.2018 | T4 | Priority number | Date | EP14167942 | 12.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI652241B | 01.03.2019 | B | TW201604163 | 01.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14167942 | 12.05.2014 |