EP3142976 - GLASS SHEET HAVING A HIGH TRANSMISSION IN THE INFRARED FOR TOUCH PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/12] | GLASS SHEET HAVING A HIGH TRANSMISSION IN THE INFRARED | ||
[2017/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGC Glass Europe Avenue Jean Monnet, 4 1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited Shin-Marunouchi Building 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2017/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMBRICHT, Thomas Rue du Baron Wigny 19 1360 Perwez / BE | 02 /
DOGIMONT, Audrey Rue Grosse Boule 9 1495 Sart-Dames-Avelines / BE | [2017/12] | Representative(s) | Bayot, Daisy AGC Glass Europe Technovation Centre IP Department Rue Louis Blériot, 12 6041 Gosselies / BE | [2017/12] | Application number, filing date | 15717495.4 | 22.04.2015 | [2017/12] | WO2015EP58643 | Priority number, date | EP20140167942 | 12.05.2014 Original published format: EP 14167942 | [2017/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015172983 | Date: | 19.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3142976 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3142976 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/087, C03C4/08, C03C4/10, G03F3/04 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
C03C3/087 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C03C4/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/0421 (US);
C03C3/091 (CN,KR);
G06F3/042 (CN,KR);
C03C2204/00 (US);
G06F2203/04109 (KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/12] | C03C3/087, C03C4/08, C03C4/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLASSCHEIBE MIT HOHER TRANSMISSION IM INFRAROTBEREICH FÜR BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRM | [2017/42] | English: | GLASS SHEET HAVING A HIGH TRANSMISSION IN THE INFRARED FOR TOUCH PANEL | [2017/42] | French: | VITRE PRÉSENTANT UN COEFFICIENT DE TRANSMISSION ÉLEVÉ DANS L'INFRAROUGE POUR PANNEAU TACTILE | [2017/42] |
Former [2017/12] | GLASSCHEIBE MIT HOHER TRANSMISSION IM INFRAROTBEREICH | ||
Former [2017/12] | GLASS SHEET HAVING A HIGH TRANSMISSION IN THE INFRARED | ||
Former [2017/12] | VITRE PRÉSENTANT UN COEFFICIENT DE TRANSMISSION ÉLEVÉ DANS L'INFRAROUGE | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/12] | 15.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 04.04.2018 | AT | 04.04.2018 | CY | 04.04.2018 | DK | 04.04.2018 | EE | 04.04.2018 | FI | 04.04.2018 | HR | 04.04.2018 | LT | 04.04.2018 | LV | 04.04.2018 | MC | 04.04.2018 | MK | 04.04.2018 | NL | 04.04.2018 | RO | 04.04.2018 | RS | 04.04.2018 | SE | 04.04.2018 | SI | 04.04.2018 | SK | 04.04.2018 | SM | 04.04.2018 | IE | 22.04.2018 | MT | 22.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | BG | 04.07.2018 | NO | 04.07.2018 | GR | 05.07.2018 | IS | 04.08.2018 | PT | 06.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
MK | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 22.04.2018 | ||
MT | 22.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 22.04.2018 | ||
MT | 22.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 22.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 22.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 04.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6461736 (NAGASHIMA YUKIHITO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,17 * figure 4; example 13; claims 1-32 * [Y] 18-20; | [XY]WO2013072113 (AGC GLASS EUROPE [BE]) [X] 1-5 * figures 1,2; examples 1,2; claims 1-15 * [Y] 17-20; | [XY]US2007161492 (SMITH DENNIS G [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] - [0013] , [0027]; example -; claims 1-15 * [Y] 17-20; | [XY]US2012058880 (SHELESTAK LARRY J [US]) [X] 1-5 * figure -; examples 1-9; claims 1-14 * [Y] 17-20; | [XY]WO2013004470 (AGC GLASS EUROPE [BE], et al) [X] 1,6-11 * figure 1; example -; claims 1-15 * [Y] 17-20; | [XY]US2006249199 (THOMSEN SCOTT V [US], et al) [X] 1,6-11 * examples 1,2; claims 1-27; tables 1-4 * [Y] 17-20; | [XY]JP2007238398 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1,6-11 * paragraph [0057]; figures 1,2; examples 1-3; tables 1,2 * [Y] 17-20; | [XY]US2005037911 (FECHNER JOERG [DE], et al) [X] 1,6-10 * figure 1; example A13; claims 1-18 * [Y] 17-20; | [XY]JP2006036626 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO) [X] 1,6-8 * paragraphs [0004] - [0007]; examples 2,4,5; tables 1,2 * [Y] 17-20; | [XY]WO2013150053 (AGC GLASS EUROPE [BE]) [X] 1,12-16 * figures 1-5; example -; claims 1-15 * [Y] 17-20; | [XY]US2010297415 (CID-AGUILAR JOSE GUADALUPE [MX], et al) [X] 1,12-16 * examples 10,11 * [Y] 17-20; | [YD]US2013021300 (WASSVIK OLA [SE]) [YD] 17-20 * paragraphs [0007] - [0012] - [0021] - [0039] * |