EP3179981 - DEVICE AND FORMULATION FOR TOPICAL TREATMENT OF PAIN AFFECTING THE VULVAR AREA OF THE FEMALE HUMAN GENITAL ORGAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grünenthal GmbH Zieglerstrasse 6 52078 Aachen / DE | [2017/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIMINO, Andre' 20 DiMino Court Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07677 / US | 02 /
PAPPAGALLO, Marco 5 East 128th Street, Apt. 1 New York, NY 10035 / US | 03 /
RICHARDSON, Michael 209 Woodland Avenue NY Wayne, PA 19087 / US | 04 /
GERSTHEIMER, Franz Kroitzheiderweg 70 52076 Aachen / DE | 05 /
QUETGLAS, Emilio Garcia CL Dali 26 19171 Cabanillas del Campo Guadalajara / ES | 06 /
DELFGAAUW, Jacqueline 110 River Drive Apt. 2603 Jersey City, NJ 07310 / US | 07 /
SCHOLZ, Andreas Hegweg 5 35398 Giessen / DE | 08 /
NIEL VAN, Johannes Schoolstraat 17 5408XM Volkel / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/25] | 01 /
DIMINO, Andre' 20 DiMino Court Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07677 / US | ||
02 /
PAPPAGALLO, Marco 5 East 128th Street Apt. 1 New York, NY 10035 / US | |||
03 /
RICHARDSON, Michael 209 Woodland Avenue NY Wayne, PA 19087 / US | |||
04 /
GERSTHEIMER, Franz Kroitzheiderweg 70 52076 Aachen / DE | |||
05 /
QUETGLAS, Emilio Garcia CL Dali 26 E-19171 Cabanillas del Campo Guadalajara / ES | |||
06 /
DELFGAAUW, Jacqueline 110 River Drive Apt. 2603 Jersey City, NJ 07310 / US | |||
07 /
SCHOLZ, Andreas Hegweg 5 35398 Giessen / DE | |||
08 /
NIEL VAN, Johannes Schoolstraat 17 5408XM Volkel / NL | Representative(s) | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 15723432.9 | 13.05.2015 | [2017/25] | WO2015EP00989 | Priority number, date | US201461993675P | 15.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461993675 P | [2017/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015172885 | Date: | 19.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3179981 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61L15/44, A61M35/00 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,CN,US);
A61L15/44 (EP,CN,US);
A61M31/00 (US);
A61K31/167 (CN);
A61K45/00 (CN);
A61K9/0034 (EP,CN,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P23/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61L2300/102 (EP,US);
A61L2300/204 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2017/25] | A61K9/00, A61L15/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/25] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND FORMULIERUNG ZUR TOPISCHE BEHANDLUNG VON SCHMERZEN, DIE DEN VULVABEREICH DES WEIBLICHEN MENSCHLICHEN GESCHLECHTSORGANS BETREFFEN | [2017/25] | English: | DEVICE AND FORMULATION FOR TOPICAL TREATMENT OF PAIN AFFECTING THE VULVAR AREA OF THE FEMALE HUMAN GENITAL ORGAN | [2017/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET COMPOSITION POUR TRAITEMENT TOPIQUE DE LA DOULEUR AFFECTANT LA ZONE VULVAIRE DU SYSTÈME GÉNITAL FÉMININ | [2017/25] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/25] | 22.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/25] | 11.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/15] | 19.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/15] | Divisional application(s) | EP19201685.5 / EP3626230 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 22.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.03.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 22.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.03.2017 | Decision despatched | 22.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.03.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 22.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.03.2017 | Decision despatched | 22.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.03.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1178846 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2,8-11,13,15-17,22,23 * pages 2-10 * * figure 1 * [I] 12; | [XI]US6468557 (LEZDEY JOHN [US], et al) [X] 18-20 * column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 5 * * claims 1, 6 * [I] 17,21-23; | [A]EP1448212 (ANTON SUSAN EVELYN [GB]) [A] 1-17,22,23 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2006014693 (RENZIN STEPHEN M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,15-17,22,23 * pages 4-6 * * figures 1-9 *; | [X]EP1782831 (MEDRX CO LTD [JP]) [X] 18-20* page 4, paragraphs 28, 32-34 * |