EP3152683 - TILE-BASED GEOCODER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2017/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERKHIN, Pavel c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
TEODORESCU, Florin c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
MEHTA, Bimal c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
OAKLEY, Andrew P. c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
WAHLSTROM, Erik C. c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
RACZ, David L. c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 07 /
SHARMA, Anurag c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 08 /
EVANS, Michael R. c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2017/15] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/15] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15729037.0 | 04.06.2015 | [2017/15] | WO2015US34090 | Priority number, date | US201414298857 | 06.06.2014 Original published format: US201414298857 | [2017/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015187895 | Date: | 10.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3152683 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
G06F16/29 (EP,CN,US);
G06F16/24578 (EP,US);
G06F16/41 (EP,US);
G06F16/444 (EP,US);
G01C21/3881 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] | Title | German: | MOSAIKBASIERTER GEOCODER | [2017/15] | English: | TILE-BASED GEOCODER | [2017/15] | French: | GÉOCODEUR BASÉ SUR UN PAVÉ | [2017/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 27.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2010119137 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11,14,15 * page 21, line 10 - page 23, line 9; figures 1,2,6 * * page 25, line 10 - line 14 * * page 26, line 32 - line 36; figures 5A-5G * * page 27, line 33 - page 32, line 9; figure 7 * [I] 1-15; | [A] - XIN CAO ET AL, "Collective spatial keyword querying", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2011 ACM SIGMOD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MANAGEMENT OF DATA, ATHENS, GR, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20110612), doi:10.1145/1989323.1989363, ISBN 978-1-4503-0661-4, pages 373 - 384, XP058003147 [A] 1,9 * section 2 * * section 3.1; figures 1,2; table 1 * * section 3.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1989323.1989363 |