01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
08.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
24.01.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
20.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
23.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
15.02.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
08.02.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.02.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.10.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.09.2018 |
Change - English title |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
21.09.2018 |
Change - French title |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
03.08.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.04.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.01.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.01.2018 |
First examination report |
|
15.09.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
15.09.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
25.08.2017 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
02.08.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.04.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
18.04.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
18.04.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
21.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.12.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
27.12.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|