Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016005358 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14176144 | 08.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017145187 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14176144 | 08.07.2014 | WO2015EP65421 | 07.07.2015 | EP15153263 | 30.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017145186 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14176144 | 08.07.2014 | WO2015EP65422 | 07.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3166998 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2018 | B1 | EP3166998 | 17.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14176144 | 08.07.2014 | WO2015EP65422 | 07.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106661269 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14176144 | 08.07.2014 | WO2015EP65421 | 07.07.2015 | EP15153263 | 30.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106471054 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14176144 | 08.07.2014 | WO2015EP65422 | 07.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2953449 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14176144 | 08.07.2014 | WO2015EP65421 | 07.07.2015 | EP15153263 | 30.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2953442 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14176144 | 08.07.2014 | WO2015EP65422 | 07.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3166997 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2019 | B1 | EP3166997 | 17.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14176144 | 08.07.2014 | WO2015EP65421 | 07.07.2015 | EP15153263 | 30.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2690120T | 19.11.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP14176144 | 08.07.2014 | WO2015EP65422 | 07.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3166998T | 31.12.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP14176144 | 08.07.2014 | EP15734381 | 07.07.2015 | WO2015EP65422 | 07.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2017103941 | 01.02.2019 | A3 | RU2017103941 | 08.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14176144 | 08.07.2014 | WO2015EP65422 | 07.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2017103942 | 31.01.2019 | A3 | RU2017103942 | 08.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14176144 | 08.07.2014 | WO2015EP65421 | 07.07.2015 | EP15153263 | 30.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201605945 | 16.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14176144 | 08.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016005357 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14176144 | 08.07.2014 | EP15153263 | 30.01.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201609628 | 16.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14176144 | 08.07.2014 | EP15153263 | 30.01.2015 |