EP3166997 - PLASTICIZER COMPOSITION WHICH COMPRISE ALIPHATIC ESTER OF DICARBOXYLIC ACID AND ALKYLESTER OF ACID TEREPHTHALIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/20] | PLASTICIZER COMPOSITION WHICH CONTAINS ALIPHATIC DICARBOXYLIC ACID ESTERS AND TEREPHTHALIC ACID DIALKYL ESTERS | ||
[2018/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFEIFFER, Matthias Kurt Schumacher-Strasse 13 67459 Böhl-Iggelheim / DE | 02 /
BREITSCHEIDEL, Boris Goethestrasse 72 67165 Waldsee / DE | 03 /
GRIMM, Axel Edesheimerstrasse 41 67480 Edenkoben / DE | 04 /
MORGENSTERN, Herbert Lindenweg 1 67158 Ellerstadt / DE | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2017/20] | Application number, filing date | 15734380.7 | 07.07.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015EP65421 | Priority number, date | EP20140176144 | 08.07.2014 Original published format: EP 14176144 | EP20150153263 | 30.01.2015 Original published format: EP 15153263 | [2017/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016005357 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3166997 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3166997 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/11, C08K5/12 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
C08K5/12 (EP,CN,US);
C08K5/11 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEICHMACHER-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DIE ALIPHATISCHE DICARBONSÄUREESTER UND TEREPHTHALSÄUREDIALKYLESTER ENTHÄLT | [2017/20] | English: | PLASTICIZER COMPOSITION WHICH COMPRISE ALIPHATIC ESTER OF DICARBOXYLIC ACID AND ALKYLESTER OF ACID TEREPHTHALIC | [2018/43] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PLASTIFIANTS COMPRENANT DES ESTERS ALIPHATIQUES D'ACIDE DICARBOXYLIQUE ET DES ALKYLESTERS D'ACIDE TÉRÉPHTALIQUE | [2018/43] |
Former [2017/20] | PLASTICIZER COMPOSITION WHICH CONTAINS ALIPHATIC DICARBOXYLIC ACID ESTERS AND TEREPHTHALIC ACID DIALKYL ESTERS | ||
Former [2017/20] | COMPOSITION DE PLASTIFIANT CONTENANT DES ESTERS D'ACIDE DICARBOXYLIQUE ALIPHATIQUES ET DES DIALKYLESTERS D'ACIDE TÉRÉPHTALIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 22.08.2017 | Observations by third parties | 10.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2015 | AL | 20.03.2019 | CY | 20.03.2019 | CZ | 20.03.2019 | DK | 20.03.2019 | EE | 20.03.2019 | ES | 20.03.2019 | FI | 20.03.2019 | HR | 20.03.2019 | LT | 20.03.2019 | LV | 20.03.2019 | MC | 20.03.2019 | MK | 20.03.2019 | MT | 20.03.2019 | PL | 20.03.2019 | RO | 20.03.2019 | RS | 20.03.2019 | SI | 20.03.2019 | SK | 20.03.2019 | SM | 20.03.2019 | TR | 20.03.2019 | BG | 20.06.2019 | NO | 20.06.2019 | GR | 21.06.2019 | GB | 07.07.2019 | IE | 07.07.2019 | IT | 07.07.2019 | LU | 07.07.2019 | SE | 08.07.2019 | IS | 20.07.2019 | PT | 20.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | FR | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | NL | 01.08.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 07.07.2015 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
MT | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
GB | 07.07.2019 | ||
IE | 07.07.2019 | ||
IT | 07.07.2019 | ||
LU | 07.07.2019 | ||
SE | 08.07.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 07.07.2015 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
GB | 07.07.2019 | ||
IE | 07.07.2019 | ||
IT | 07.07.2019 | ||
LU | 07.07.2019 | ||
SE | 08.07.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
GB | 07.07.2019 | ||
IE | 07.07.2019 | ||
IT | 07.07.2019 | ||
LU | 07.07.2019 | ||
SE | 08.07.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
GB | 07.07.2019 | ||
IE | 07.07.2019 | ||
IT | 07.07.2019 | ||
LU | 07.07.2019 | ||
SE | 08.07.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
GB | 07.07.2019 | ||
IE | 07.07.2019 | ||
LU | 07.07.2019 | ||
SE | 08.07.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
GB | 07.07.2019 | ||
LU | 07.07.2019 | ||
SE | 08.07.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
GB | 07.07.2019 | ||
LU | 07.07.2019 | ||
SE | 08.07.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
GB | 07.07.2019 | ||
SE | 08.07.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
GB | 07.07.2019 | ||
SE | 08.07.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 20.03.2019 | |
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 20.03.2019 | |
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE60221398T (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [A] 1-18,21,22 * page 2, paragraphs 3-5,8 * * page 3, paragraph 14; examples 3-4; table - *; | [A]US2007037926 (OLSEN DAVID J [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * page 1, paragraphs 3,6; example 1 *; | [AD]US6437170 (THIL LUCIEN [DE], et al) [AD] 1-22 * column 2, lines 25-53 *; | [A]JP2006219684 ; | [A]CN103012944 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 60, Database accession no. 2006-582762, XP002743636 & JP2006219684 A 20060824 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND LTD) [A] 1-22 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 77, Database accession no. 2013-P23115, XP002743637 & CN103012944 A 20130403 (NINGBO JULONG RUBBER PLASTIC&ELECTROME) [A] 1-22 * abstract * | Examination | US2010108235 | WO2012069278 | US2003014948 | by applicant | WO9932427 | WO0078704 | US7973194 | WO03029339 | WO2009095126 | EP1354867 | EP1415978 | WO0238531 | US6310235 | US5324853 | DE2612355 | DE1945359 | US5288918 | DE1593368 | DE2139630 | DE2244373 | DE2404855 | WO0114297 | US4148830 | EP0695734 | EP0880494 | EP1047655 | DE3228881 | DE2628987 | DE2445303 | WO0187809 | WO9514647 | US2921089 | WO2005028407 | WO02083695 | EP0366089 | US4426524 | US5434313 | WO9823566 | WO0063151 | DE4339713 | - "Polyvinylchlorid", BECKER; BRAUN, Kunststoff-Handbuch, 2. Auflage,, CARL HANSER VERLAG, vol. 2/1 | - FALBE, New Syntheses with Carbon Monoxide, SPRINGER, (1980), pages 162 - 168 | - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry; 5. Auflage,, VCH VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT GMBH, (1987), vol. A 10, pages 137 - 140 | - CHAUVIN ET AL., CHEM. IND., (197405), pages 375 - 378 | - CORNILS; HERMANN, Applied Homogeneous Catalysis with Organometallic Compounds; 2. Auflage;, WILEY-VCH, (2002), vol. 1, pages 254 - 259 | - HYDROCARBON PROCESSING, (198602), pages 31 - 33 | - CHITNIS ET AL., HYDROCARBON ENGINEERING, (200506), vol. 10, no. 6 | - WEISERMEL, Arpe: Industrielle Organische Chemie; 5. Auflage;, WILEY-VCH, (1998), page 96 | - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry; 5. Auflage;, VCH VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT GMBH, (1995), vol. A1, pages 291 - 292 | - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry; 5. Auflage;, VCH VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT GMBH, (1985), vol. A1, page 293 | other | US2010108235 | WO2012069278 |