|
02.03.2021 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2020 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2020 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Withdrawal of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2020 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.02.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.02.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2017 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2017 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.01.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
08.10.2015 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
28.08.2015 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
28.08.2015 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.08.2015 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
07.08.2015 |
Invitation to correct defects in the international application |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
07.08.2015 |
Invitation to correct defects in the international application |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
04.08.2015 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
17 |