04.06.2021 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
03.03.2021 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.10.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.08.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.04.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.02.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
26.12.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.12.2018 |
First examination report |
|
09.11.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
03.08.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.11.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
03.11.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
02.08.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2017 |
Change - inventor |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
02.06.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] |
02.06.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
02.06.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] |
09.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.01.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.01.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
27.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|