Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10030860 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2018 | B2 | US2017254524 | 07.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14182484 | 27.08.2014 | WO2015EP67509 | 30.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106576417B | Global Dossier | 06.08.2019 | B | CN106576417 | 19.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14182484 | 27.08.2014 | WO2015EP67509 | 30.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3186550 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14182484 | 27.08.2014 | WO2015EP67509 | 30.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016030123 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14182484 | 27.08.2014 |