EP3186550 - HEAVY LIGHT, AMBIENT EXPERIENCE LUMINAIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signify Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/11] |
Former [2018/50] | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2017/27] | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGMAN, Anthonie Hendrik c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SIEPEL, Anika, Nelleke c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
VAN DER ZWAAG, Marjolein Dimmie c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/35] |
Former [2017/27] | 01 /
BERGMAN, Anthonie Hendrik c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
SIEPEL, Anika, Nelleke c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
03 /
VAN DER ZWAAG, Marjolein Dimmie c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/27] | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle Philips Lighting B.V. Philips Lighting Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 15750290.7 | 30.07.2015 | [2017/27] | WO2015EP67509 | Priority number, date | EP20140182484 | 27.08.2014 Original published format: EP 14182484 | [2017/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016030123 | Date: | 03.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3186550 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F21V23/04, F21V33/00, F21S6/00, A63B23/18 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
F21V23/0492 (EP,US);
H05B47/10 (EP,CN,US);
A63B23/185 (US);
F21S6/004 (EP,US);
F21V33/008 (EP,US);
H05B45/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] | Title | German: | HEAVY-LIGHT-LEUCHTE MIT UMGEBUNGSERFAHRUNG | [2017/27] | English: | HEAVY LIGHT, AMBIENT EXPERIENCE LUMINAIRE | [2017/27] | French: | LUMINAIRE À EXPÉRIENCE AMBIANTE HEAVY LIGHT | [2017/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 17.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/27] | 02.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE19653081 (RIXEN & KAUL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4,8 * figure 3 *; | [AD]EP1110198 (WYNNE WILLSON GOTTELIER LTD [GB]) [AD] 1,13* claims 1,9,11,12,27 *; | [XYI]WO03008858 (MATHMOS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,7,13 * page 2, line 3 - line 11 * * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 2 * * page 7, line 17 - line 22 * * page 11, line 14 - line 23 * * page 12, line 18 - page 13, line 2 * * figures 1-3,6 * [Y] 4,8 [I] 9-12; | [X]EP2407708 (HEUBL ISABEL [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,13 * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * figure - *; | [XI]US2013225037 (DELUZ PATRICK [US]) [X] 1-4,13 * figures 21A-21C,30 * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0114] * [I] 7,9-12; | [XI]US2014210375 (NAUMANN CURTIS WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1-3,13,14 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020] * * figure - * [I] 9-12 |