24.08.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.08.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.06.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.08.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.08.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.12.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.09.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.09.2020 |
First examination report |
|
26.08.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.08.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.08.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.11.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
24.11.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
01.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.06.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] |
23.06.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
23.06.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] |
30.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.04.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.09.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|