Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10591311 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2020 | B2 | US2017191850 | 06.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP68737 | 14.08.2015 | DE102014218806 | 18.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3260346 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15756863 | 14.08.2015 | DE102014218806 | 18.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3194231 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP68737 | 14.08.2015 | DE102014218806 | 18.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016041712 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014218806 | 18.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102014218806 | 24.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014218806 | 18.09.2014 | Type | Divisional application | EP3260346 |