EP3194231 - METHOD, DEVICE, SYSTEM, COMPUTER PROGRAM, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR DISPLAYING DRIVING ROUTE SECTION FACTORS INFLUENCING A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUGST, Alexander Am Haag 3 80937 Muenchen / DE | [2017/30] | Application number, filing date | 15756863.5 | 14.08.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015EP68737 | Priority number, date | DE201410218806 | 18.09.2014 Original published format: DE102014218806 | [2017/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016041712 | Date: | 24.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3194231 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60W50/00, B60W10/22, B60W50/14 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
B60W50/0097 (EP,US);
G01C21/3697 (EP,US);
B60K35/00 (EP);
B60K35/10 (EP);
B60W10/22 (EP,US);
B60W50/14 (EP,US);
B60K2360/141 (EP);
B60K2360/1438 (EP);
B60W2050/146 (EP,US);
B60W2552/30 (EP,US);
B60W2552/35 (EP,US);
B60W2556/30 (US);
B60W2556/35 (US);
B60W2556/45 (EP,US);
G01C21/3635 (US);
G01C21/365 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM, COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZUR ANZEIGE VON EINFLUSSFAKTOREN VON FAHRSTRECKENABSCHNITTEN AUF EIN FAHRZEUG | [2017/30] | English: | METHOD, DEVICE, SYSTEM, COMPUTER PROGRAM, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR DISPLAYING DRIVING ROUTE SECTION FACTORS INFLUENCING A VEHICLE | [2017/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF, SYSTÈME DE PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR ET PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR POUR AFFICHER DES FACTEURS D'INFLUENCE DE TRONÇONS DE PARCOURS SUR UN VÉHICULE | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 23.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP17162728.4 / EP3260346 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2009164063 (PICCININI SANDRO [IT], et al) [I] 1-27 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1-5 *; | [I]US2012203428 (CHOI DAVE [JP], et al) [I] 1-27 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1-3C *; | [XI]GB2492896 (LAND ROVER UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,9,12-20,22-24,26,27 * page 2, line 25 - page 19, line 5; figures 1,2 * [I] 5-8,10,11,21,25; | [XI]GB2494528 (LAND ROVER UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1-8,12,15-17,21-24,26,27 * page 2, line 6 - page 13, line 33; figures 1-7 * [I] 9-11,13,14,18-20,25; | [XI]DE102012017932 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-12,15,17-19,22-24,26,27 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-7 * [I] 4-6,13,14,16,20,21,25; | [I]DE102012017118 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [I] 1-27* paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0055]; figure 1 *; | [XI]WO2014108556 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-6,9,10,12,15-20,22-24,26,27 * page 3, line 4 - page 18, line 3; figures 1-7 * [I] 7,8,11,13,14,21,25 |