Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10396458 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2019 | B2 | US2017084996 | 23.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201410249347 | 06.06.2014 | WO2015CN80723 | 03.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6393786B | Global Dossier | 19.09.2018 | B2 | JP2017520182 | 20.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201410249347 | 06.06.2014 | WO2015CN80723 | 03.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3144947 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2018 | B1 | EP3144947 | 26.07.2017 | A4 | EP3144947 | 22.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201410249347 | 06.06.2014 | WO2015CN80723 | 03.06.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015184995 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201410249347 | 06.06.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104090531B | Global Dossier | 04.01.2017 | B | CN104090531 | 08.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201410249347 | 06.06.2014 |