EP3163156 - INDIRECT LIGHTING APPARATUS USING LED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KMW Inc. 183-6, Yeongcheon-ro Dongtan-myeon Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-813 / KR | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Duk-Yong 183-6 Yeongcheon-ro Dongtan-myeon Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-813 / KR | 02 /
RYU, Myeong-Kyu 183-6 Yeongcheon-ro Dongtan-myeon Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-813 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Myoung-Seo 183-6 Yeongcheon-ro Dongtan-myeon Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-813 / KR | 04 /
YOO, Seung-Bum 183-6 Yeongcheon-ro Dongtan-myeon Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-813 / KR | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Scheele Jaeger Wetzel Patentanwälte Goethestraße 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | RatnerPrestia Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15811151.8 | 18.06.2015 | [2017/18] | WO2015KR06182 | Priority number, date | KR20140078331 | 25.06.2014 Original published format: KR 20140078331 | [2017/18] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015199374 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3163156 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F21V7/04, F21S8/04 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
F21S8/037 (EP);
F21V7/0008 (US);
F21S8/033 (US);
F21S8/04 (US);
F21V23/005 (US);
F21V3/02 (US);
F21V7/005 (EP);
F21V7/04 (US);
F21V7/09 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Title | German: | INDIREKTE BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT LED | [2017/18] | English: | INDIRECT LIGHTING APPARATUS USING LED | [2017/18] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE INDIRECT METTANT EN OEUVRE UNE DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2017 | Translation filed | 04.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 04.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 29.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH08310775 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-2 * See paragraphs [0026]-[0033], claims 1-8 and figures 1-6. * [Y] 3-6; | [Y]JP2000011719 (DAIWA HOUSE IND) [Y] 6 * See abstract, paragraphs [0012]-[0014] and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US7470034 (PANG SIEW IT [MY]) [A] 1-6 * See abstract, column 2, line 37-column 3, line 12 and figures 1-2. *; | [A]KR20110091950 (KIM DOO HWAN [KR]) [A] 1-6* See abstract, paragraphs [0012]-[0016] and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]KR20140036809 (KIM JAE BONG [KR]) [Y] 3-5 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0029], claims 1-2 and figures 5-7. * |