EP3201166 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS COMPRISING SALICYLATES AND POLYSALICYLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biocogent, LLC 25 Health Sciences Drive Stony Brook, NY 11790 / US | For all designated states Ceccoli, Joseph D. 26 Neil Drive Farmingville, NY 11738 / US | For all designated states Ingrassia, Michael L. 260 Marlo Lane Hauppauge, NY 11788 / US | For all designated states Judd, Christopher M. 75 Pegs Lane Riverhead, NY 11901 / US | For all designated states Costello, Brian R. 149 Captains Way Port Jefferson Station, NY 11776 / US | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CECCOLI, Joseph D. 26 Neil Drive Farmingville, NY 11738 / US | 02 /
INGRASSIA, Michael L. 260 Marlo Lane Hauppauge, NY 11788 / US | 03 /
JUDD, Christopher M. 75 Pegs Lane Riverhead, NY 11901 / US | 04 /
COSTELLO, Brian R. 149 Captains Way Port Jefferson Station, NY 11776 / US | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Gerbino, Angelo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2017/32] | Application number, filing date | 15822615.9 | 17.07.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015US40854 | Priority number, date | US201462026154P | 18.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462026154 P | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016011319 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3201166 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/18, C07C69/84, C07C69/86, A61K8/37, A61K8/85, A61Q19/00, A61K31/765, A61P29/00 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
A61K8/37 (EP,KR,US);
C07C67/18 (EP,KR,US);
C07C67/08 (US);
A61K31/765 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/85 (EP,KR,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (US);
A61Q19/005 (EP,KR,US);
C07C67/62 (KR);
C08G63/065 (US);
C08G63/81 (US);
G01N33/5008 (KR);
A61K2800/74 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/18, C07C69/84 (EP,US);
C07C67/18, C07C69/86 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2017/32] | C07C51/353, C07C65/105 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN MIT SALICYLATEN UND POLYSALICYLATEN | [2017/32] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS COMPRISING SALICYLATES AND POLYSALICYLATES | [2017/32] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS COMPRENANT DES SALICYLATES ET DES POLYSALICYLATES | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/32] | 25.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 25.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 17.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 25.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.06.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 25.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.06.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 25.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.06.2017 | Decision despatched | 25.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.06.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 25.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.06.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5922785 (WALLER DUNCAN E [US], et al) [X] 9 * column 2, lines 26-54 *; | [X]US2005080074 (WACKER DEAN A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * page 33, paragraph 243 *; | [I]WO2010006085 (CATABASIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [I] 15-17 * claims * * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] *; | [X]US7932417 (MENTLIK ANTON A [US], et al) [X] 9,14 * claim 6 *; | [X]US2012288460 (MAES DANIEL H [US], et al) [X] 9,14 * pages 1,9,20 * * paragraph [0003] *; | [XP]WO2015070354 (AURIN BIOTECH INC [CA]) [XP] 9,14 * abstract * * claims 1,7 *; | [E]WO2015120153 (BIOCOGENT LLC [US], et al) [E] 1-14 * claims 2,6-8,12-15 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0043] ** figures 11,13-17 *; | [XI] - BIERER D E ET AL, "Novel 1,2-dithiins: synthesis, molecular modeling studies, and antifungal activity", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19950707), vol. 38, no. 14, doi:10.1021/JM00014A016, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2628 - 2648, XP002173882 [X] 1-3,5,8-10 * page 2640, column 1, last paragraph - column 2, paragraph 1 * [I] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00014a016 | [X] - KEIICHI ITO ET AL, "Photoreactions of 4- and 3-azidocoumarins in the presence of nucleophiles", HETEROCYCLES, (1993), vol. 35, no. 2, pages 937 - 947, XP009505239 [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 941, scheme 6 * * page 946, paragraph last - page 947, paragraph 1 * | [X] - KAWAMURA Y ET AL, "Dehydration Induced by Intramolecular Redox Character of a Stable Allylidenetributylphosphorane", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19971110), vol. 38, no. 45, doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(97)10099-5, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 7893 - 7896, XP004097199 [X] 1,2,7,12,13 * page 7894, table 1, last entry and reference b) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(97)10099-5 | International search | [Y]US4855483 (WHITE DWAIN M [US], et al) [Y] 9, 12-13 * ; claims 1-7 *; | [A]US5185027 (VOGELBACHER UWE J [DE], et al) [A] 1-21* ; entire document *; | [A]US5326739 (TANABE YOSHIMITSU [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * ; entire document *; | [Y]WO9924076 (CONJUCHEM INC [CA], et al) [Y] 7 * ; page 22, lines 1-5. *; | [A]US6300459 (KANEKO HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * ; entire document *; | [A]US6410777 (KANEKO HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * ; entire document *; | [A]US6696591 (CASTALDI GRAZIANO [IT], et al) [A] 1-21 * ; entire document *; | [XY]US2011288057 (COTESTA SIMONA [CH], et al) [X] 1-6, 10-11, 15 * ; paragraphs [0013], [0040]-[0042], [0061], [0073]-[0075], [0078], [0080], [0225]-[0230] * [Y] 7-9, 12-14, 18-21; | [Y]CN102627554B (LIFECOME BIOCHEMISTRY CO LTD) [Y] 8, 14 * ; see English translation; abstract; claim 1 *; | [X]US2013310349 (MENTLIK ANTON A [US], et al) [X] 16-17 * ; abstract; paragraph [0007] *; | [Y]US2014079631 (SERHAN CHARLES N [US], et al) [Y] 18-21 * ; paragraphs [0009]-[0010], [0030], [0049], [0062] * |