Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10065934 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2018 | B2 | US2017114032 | 27.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN84253 | 16.07.2015 | CN201410342509 | 17.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102485100B | Global Dossier | 04.01.2023 | B1 | KR20170031669 | 21.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN84253 | 16.07.2015 | CN201410342509 | 17.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6665154B | Global Dossier | 13.03.2020 | B2 | JP2017520607 | 27.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN84253 | 16.07.2015 | CN201410342509 | 17.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105272930B | Global Dossier | 13.07.2018 | B | CN105272930 | 27.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201510422604 | 16.07.2015 | CN201410342509 | 17.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2952083 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2023 | C | CA2952083 | 21.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN84253 | 16.07.2015 | CN201410342509 | 17.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015291522B | Global Dossier | 06.12.2018 | B2 | AU2015291522 | 22.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN84253 | 16.07.2015 | CN201410342509 | 17.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3169671 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2019 | B1 | EP3169671 | 28.02.2018 | A4 | EP3169671 | 24.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN84253 | 16.07.2015 | CN201410342509 | 17.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3169671T | 23.09.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN84253 | 16.07.2015 | CN201410342509 | 17.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2747249T | 10.03.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN84253 | 16.07.2015 | CN201410342509 | 17.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1232224 | 05.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN84253 | 16.07.2015 | CN201410342509 | 17.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016008433 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201410342509 | 17.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE046008T | 28.02.2020 | T2 | Priority number | Date | CN201410342509 | 17.07.2014 |