01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
27.03.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
19.04.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.04.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
16.12.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.12.2018 |
Change - inventor |
|
30.11.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
30.11.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
13.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.02.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.10.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
06.10.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
26.07.2017 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
25.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.07.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
21.07.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
15.06.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] |
15.06.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.06.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] |
10.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.01.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
25.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|