EP3176850 - POWER STORAGE MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AutoNetworks Technologies, Ltd. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8503 / JP | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8503 / JP | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2017/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUBOKI, Hideyuki c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8503 / JP | 02 /
HIRAI, Hiroki c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8503 / JP | 03 /
SAKATA, Tomoyuki c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8503 / JP | 04 /
HIGASHIKOZONO, Makoto c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8503 / JP | 05 /
NAKAGAWA, Kenji c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8503 / JP | [2019/21] |
Former [2017/23] | 01 /
KUBOKI Hideyuki c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8503 / JP | ||
02 /
HIRAI Hiroki c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8503 / JP | |||
03 /
SAKATA Tomoyuki c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8503 / JP | |||
04 /
HIGASHIKOZONO Makoto c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8503 / JP | |||
05 /
NAKAGAWA Kenji c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8503 / JP | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/23] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15828322.6 | 29.07.2015 | [2017/23] | WO2015JP71482 | Priority number, date | JP20140155247 | 30.07.2014 Original published format: JP 2014155247 | [2017/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016017683 | Date: | 04.02.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3176850 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3176850 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01G2/04, H01G2/16, H01G11/16, H01M2/34, H01G11/12, H01M2/02, H01G11/76, H01G11/82, H01M2/20, H01M2/30, H01M10/48 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
H01G2/16 (EP,US);
H01G11/12 (EP,US);
H01G11/16 (EP,US);
H01G11/76 (EP,US);
H01G11/82 (EP,US);
H01G2/04 (EP,US);
H01M10/482 (EP,US);
H01M50/178 (EP,US);
H01M50/211 (EP,US);
H01M50/55 (EP,US);
H01M50/553 (EP,US);
H01M50/569 (EP,US);
H01M50/581 (EP,US);
H01M2200/103 (EP,US);
H01M2220/20 (US);
H01M50/51 (EP,US);
H01M50/516 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/34] | H01M2/10, H01G2/04, H01G2/16, H01G11/16, H01M2/34, H01G11/12, H01M2/02, H01G11/76, H01G11/82 | ||
Former IPC [2017/23] | H01M2/10, H01G2/04, H01G2/16, H01G11/16, H01M2/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSSPEICHERMODUL | [2017/23] | English: | POWER STORAGE MODULE | [2017/23] | French: | MODULE DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2017/23] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2017 | Translation filed | 25.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 25.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2015 | AL | 22.05.2019 | AT | 22.05.2019 | CY | 22.05.2019 | CZ | 22.05.2019 | DK | 22.05.2019 | EE | 22.05.2019 | ES | 22.05.2019 | FI | 22.05.2019 | HR | 22.05.2019 | IT | 22.05.2019 | LT | 22.05.2019 | LV | 22.05.2019 | MC | 22.05.2019 | MK | 22.05.2019 | MT | 22.05.2019 | NL | 22.05.2019 | PL | 22.05.2019 | RO | 22.05.2019 | RS | 22.05.2019 | SE | 22.05.2019 | SI | 22.05.2019 | SK | 22.05.2019 | SM | 22.05.2019 | TR | 22.05.2019 | IE | 29.07.2019 | LU | 29.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | FR | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | BG | 22.08.2019 | GB | 22.08.2019 | NO | 22.08.2019 | GR | 23.08.2019 | IS | 22.09.2019 | PT | 22.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 29.07.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IE | 29.07.2019 | ||
LU | 29.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GB | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 29.07.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IE | 29.07.2019 | ||
LU | 29.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GB | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IE | 29.07.2019 | ||
LU | 29.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GB | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IE | 29.07.2019 | ||
LU | 29.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GB | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IE | 29.07.2019 | ||
LU | 29.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GB | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IE | 29.07.2019 | ||
LU | 29.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GB | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IE | 29.07.2019 | ||
LU | 29.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LU | 29.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LU | 29.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 22.05.2019 | |
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 22.05.2019 | |
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0892450 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 3; claims 1,5 *; | [A]US6152776 (IKEDA TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * columns 5-7 *; | [Y]US2011244283 (SETO SADASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0053] - [0056] *; | [YA]JP2012195305 (NEC CORP, et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0057]; figures 1, 2; claim 1 * [A] 1,2; | [A]US2014134464 (JANG SOO YEUP [KR], et al) [A] 1-3* abstract * | International search | [A]JP2002222626 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006190529 (NEC LAMILION ENERGY LTD) [A] 1-3 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [XA]JP2012195305 (NEC CORP, et al) [X] 1 * , claim 6; paragraphs [0017], [0036] to [0040]; fig. 2, 10, 11 (Family: none) * [A] 2, 3; | [A]JP2014093218 (YAZAKI CORP) [A] 1-3* , entire text & CN 103811706 A * |