26.11.2021 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
22.08.2021 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.05.2021 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.01.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.11.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.04.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
28.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.01.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.10.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.06.2019 |
First examination report |
|
19.06.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.04.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
21.09.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
21.09.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
25.05.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
25.05.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
23.02.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
19.01.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
19.01.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
19.01.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
12.01.2018 |
Change - inventor |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
16.12.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.11.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.08.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
25.08.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
25.08.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
28.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.06.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
16.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|