Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022140313 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2014904615 | 17.11.2014 | US202117513078 | 28.10.2021 | US201715526662 | 12.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019103599 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015AU50722 | 17.11.2015 | AU2014904615 | 17.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021201413 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015AU50722 | 17.11.2015 | AU2014904615 | 17.11.2014 | AU2021201413 | 04.03.2021 | AU2015349612 | 17.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015349612 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015AU50722 | 17.11.2015 | AU2014904615 | 17.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3221910 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2018 | A4 | EP3221910 | 27.09.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2015AU50722 | 17.11.2015 | AU2014904615 | 17.11.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016077880 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2016 | A3 | WO2016077880 | 26.05.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | AU2014904615 | 17.11.2014 |