EP3221910 - GRAPHENE ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imagine Intelligent Materials Ltd PO Box 1140 Menai NSW 2234 / AU | [2018/13] |
Former [2018/08] | For all designated states Imagine Intelligent Materials Pty Ltd PO Box 1140 Menai, NSW 2234 / AU | ||
Former [2017/39] | For all designated states Imagine Intelligent Materials Pty Ltd Suite 302 Level 3 105 Pitt Street Sydney 2000 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AITCHISON, Phillip Suite 302 Level 3 105 Pitt Street Sydney, New South Wales / AU | 02 /
GRANT, Mathleson 7 Tracey Court Athelstone SA 5076 / AU | [2018/07] |
Former [2017/39] | 01 /
AITCHISON, Phillip Suite 302 Level 3 105 Pitt Street Sydney, New South Wales / AU | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Andrea Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/39] | Fleuchaus, Andrea Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Steinerstrasse 15/A 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15862112.8 | 17.11.2015 | [2017/39] | WO2015AU50722 | Priority number, date | AU20140904615 | 17.11.2014 Original published format: AU 2014904615 | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016077880 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3221910 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 23.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C01B32/192, H01M4/133, H01M4/583, H01M4/62, H01G11/24, H01G11/36, C02F1/461, C02F1/469, C02F103/08 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
H01M4/133 (EP,US);
C01B32/192 (EP,US);
C02F1/46109 (EP,US);
C02F1/4691 (EP,US);
H01G11/24 (EP,US);
H01G11/36 (EP,US);
H01M4/583 (EP,US);
H01M4/623 (EP,US);
C02F2103/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/39] | H01M4/133, H01M4/96, H01M4/86, H01M4/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Title | German: | GRAPHENELEKTRODE | [2017/39] | English: | GRAPHENE ELECTRODE | [2017/39] | French: | ÉLECTRODE EN GRAPHÈNE | [2017/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 18.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/52] | 20.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011284805 (SAMULSKI EDWARD T [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9 * paragraph [0078]; examples 1-3; claims 2,5 *; | [A]WO2012057702 (UNIV NANYANG TECH [SG], et al) [A] 1-5,7-9 * page 14, line 28 - page 18, line 25; claim 17 * * page 20, line 17 - line 23 * * page 21, line 27 - page 22, line 11 *; | [A]KR101207463B (SION TECH CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-5,7-9* example 2 *; | [AD]US8715610 (WALLACE GORDON GEORGE [AU], et al) [AD] 1-5,7-9 * column 5, line 26 - line 63; examples 1,2 *; | [X]WO2014078807 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 1-3,9 * paragraphs [0016] , [0034] , [0120] , [0134] - [0136]; figures 1,5,8B; claims 2,4 * | International search | [X]WO2014078807 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 1-7, 11, 15-16, 22-26, 32-35 * abstract, paragraphs [0003], [0015]-[0017], [0113], [0127]-[0154], [0162], figs, claims *; | [X]US2013022811 (AHN JONG-HYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1 * abstract, [0018]-[0019], claims *; | [X]WO2012057702 (UNIV NANYANG TECH [SG], et al) [X] 1, 2, 7, 32, 35 * abstract, page 4 lines 17-27, page 18 line 10- page 19 line 31, page 20 lines 1-8, page 20 lines 17-23, page 22 lines 1-11, page 22 lines 24-27, claims *; | [X]US2011284805 (SAMULSKI EDWARD T [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 7, 15-20, 32-34 * abstract, paragraphs [0004], [0078], [0047], [0081], claims *; | [X]WO2013027561 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP], et al) [X] 1, 2, 27, 29-30, 32 * abstract, paragraph [0060]-[0072], claims *; | [X]US2012308884 (OGUNI TEPPEI [JP], et al) [X] 1, 2, 27, 29-30, 32 * abstract, paragraphs [0020]-[0023], [0029], [0040], [0051]-[0067], [0073]-[0090], claims *; | [X]CA2766085 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [X] 1 * abstract, page 1 line 27- page 2 line 2, page 4 lines 25-31, claims *; | [X]US2013102084 (LOH KIAN PING [SG], et al) [X] 1, 2, 32 * abstract, paragraph[0008], [0115]-[0116], claims *; | [X]US2014120270 (TOUR JAMES M [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract, paragraph [0108] *; | [X]US2011287241 (KORKUT SIBEL [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 7, 15-20, 22, 32 * abstract, paragraphs [0004], [0078], [0047] * |