Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017306130 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014241896 | 28.11.2014 | WO2015JP81142 | 05.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2016084569 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014241896 | 28.11.2014 | WO2015JP81142 | 05.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107001706 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014241896 | 28.11.2014 | WO2015JP81142 | 05.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3214122 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2018 | A4 | EP3214122 | 06.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014241896 | 28.11.2014 | WO2015JP81142 | 05.11.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016084569 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014241896 | 28.11.2014 |