EP3214122 - RUBBER COMPOSITION FOR TIRE OUTER LAYER, AND PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2017/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAZAKI Tatsuya c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LTD. 6-9 Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2017/36] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/36] | Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15863875.9 | 05.11.2015 | [2017/36] | WO2015JP81142 | Priority number, date | JP20140241896 | 28.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014241896 | [2017/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016084569 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3214122 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08L9/00, B60C1/00, C08J3/16, C08K5/10, C08K5/47, C08L7/00, C08L71/02, C08K5/103 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
C08L7/00 (EP,US);
B60C1/00 (EP,US);
B60C1/0016 (EP,US);
B60C1/0025 (EP,US);
C08J3/16 (EP,US);
C08K5/10 (EP,US);
C08K5/103 (EP,US);
C08K5/47 (EP,US);
C08L15/00 (EP,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,US);
C08L9/00 (EP,US);
B60C2001/005 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/103, C08L7/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/47, C08L7/00 (US,EP);
C08L15/00, C08L9/00, C08L15/00, C08L91/00, C08L91/06, C08L71/02, C08K3/06, C08K5/18, C08K5/3437, C08K5/09, C08K3/22, C08K3/04, C08K5/47 (US,EP);
C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08L15/00, C08L71/02, C08L57/02, C08L91/06, C08K3/06, C08K5/18, C08K5/3437, C08K5/09, C08K3/22, C08K3/04, C08K5/47 (US,EP);
C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08L15/00, C08L91/00, C08L91/06, C08L71/02, C08K3/06, C08K5/18, C08K5/3437, C08K5/09, C08K3/22, C08K3/04, C08K5/47 (US,EP);
C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08L9/00, C08L15/00, C08L91/00, C08L91/06, C08L71/02, C08K3/06, C08K5/18, C08K5/3437, C08K5/09, C08K3/22, C08K3/04, C08K5/47 (EP,US);
C08L9/00, C08L15/00, C08L9/00, C08L91/00, C08L91/06, C08L71/02, C08K3/06, C08K5/18, C08K5/3437, C08K5/09, C08K3/22, C08K3/04, C08K5/47 (EP,US)
(-) |
Former IPC [2017/36] | C08L9/00, B60C1/00, C08J3/16, C08K5/10, C08K5/47, C08L7/00, C08L71/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Title | German: | KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR REIFENAUSSENSCHICHT UND LUFTREIFEN | [2017/36] | English: | RUBBER COMPOSITION FOR TIRE OUTER LAYER, AND PNEUMATIC TIRE | [2017/36] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC POUR COUCHE EXTÉRIEURE DE PNEU ET PNEU | [2017/36] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2017 | Translation filed | 01.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 01.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2011012164 ; | [A]JPH0881504 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD, et al)[A] 1-6; | [P]WO2015145843 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]); | [E]EP3118250 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [E] 1-6 * paragraphs [0028] , [0129] , [0130]; examples 3-1,3-2; claims 4,7,8; table 7 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2011, no. 10, Database accession no. 2011-A92467, XP002780223 & JP2011012164 A 20110120 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1,3-6 * abstract * | International search | [YA]JPH0881504 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD, et al) [Y] 3, 4 * , claims; paragraphs [0003] to [0006]; examples (Family: none) * [A] 1, 2, 5, 6; | [Y]JPH10231389 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-6 * , claims; examples & EP 849316 A1 claims; examples & DE 69707409 D & ES 2164306 T *; | [Y]JP2003504478 (Societe de Technologie Michelin) [Y] 1-6 * , claims; paragraph [0001]; examples & US 2001/0051677 A1 claims; paragraph [0002]; examples & WO 2001/004203 A1 & DE 60003629 D & AU 5827500 A & ES 2202148 T *; | [Y]JP2003238740 (BRIDGESTONE CORP, et al) [Y] 1-6 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2005502753 (Bridgestone Corp.) [Y] 1-6 * , claims; examples & WO 2003/022914 A1 claims; examples & EP 1425338 A1 *; | [Y]JP2009235349 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-6 * , claims; paragraph [0004] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2009235343 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-6 * , claims; paragraph [0004] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2009235344 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-6 * , claims; paragraph [0004] (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2010124977 (PIRELLI [IT], et al) [Y] 1-6 * , claims; examples & CN 102574420 A & IT MI20090728 A1 *; | [YA]WO2011155561 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP], et al) [Y] 3, 4 * , claims; examples & US 2013/0066021 A1 claims; examples & EP 2581390 A1 & CN 102892788 A & RU 2012156034 A *[A] 1, 2, 5, 6; | [Y]JP2012149146 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [Y] 1-6 * , claims; paragraph [0013]; examples (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2012255066 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD:THE) [Y] 1-6 * , paragraph [0003] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2013064102 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [Y] 1-6 * , claims; paragraph [0093]; examples & US 2014/0102611 A1 claims; paragraph [0105]; examples & CN 103764745 A & KR 10-2014-0053899 A *; | [Y]JP2013181059 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [Y] 1-6 * , claims; paragraph [0034]; examples & US 2013/0225757 A1 claims; paragraph [0031]; examples & CN 103333371 A * |