EP3334229 - DATA TRANSMISSION APPARATUS, METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Mingchao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HAN, Guanglin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
XIAO, Xiao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
HUA, Yao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/24] | Application number, filing date | 15904423.9 | 24.09.2015 | [2018/24] | WO2015CN90567 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017049536 | Date: | 30.03.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3334229 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3334229 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W72/02 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP,US);
H04W72/1263 (US);
H04W72/04 (US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04W72/21 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/24] | H04W72/04, H04W88/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, -VERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM | [2018/24] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION APPARATUS, METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2018/24] | French: | APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES | [2018/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2018 | Translation filed | 08.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 08.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2015 | AL | 24.08.2022 | AT | 24.08.2022 | BG | 24.08.2022 | CY | 24.08.2022 | CZ | 24.08.2022 | DK | 24.08.2022 | EE | 24.08.2022 | ES | 24.08.2022 | FI | 24.08.2022 | HR | 24.08.2022 | IT | 24.08.2022 | LT | 24.08.2022 | LV | 24.08.2022 | MC | 24.08.2022 | MK | 24.08.2022 | MT | 24.08.2022 | NL | 24.08.2022 | PL | 24.08.2022 | RO | 24.08.2022 | RS | 24.08.2022 | SE | 24.08.2022 | SI | 24.08.2022 | SK | 24.08.2022 | SM | 24.08.2022 | IE | 24.09.2022 | LU | 24.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | FR | 24.10.2022 | GB | 24.11.2022 | NO | 24.11.2022 | GR | 25.11.2022 | IS | 24.12.2022 | PT | 26.12.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 24.09.2015 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
BG | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
IT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
MK | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 24.09.2022 | ||
LU | 24.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 24.10.2022 | ||
GB | 24.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 24.09.2015 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
IT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
MK | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 24.09.2022 | ||
LU | 24.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 24.10.2022 | ||
GB | 24.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 24.09.2015 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
IT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 24.09.2022 | ||
LU | 24.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 24.10.2022 | ||
GB | 24.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 24.09.2015 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 24.09.2022 | ||
LU | 24.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 24.10.2022 | ||
GB | 24.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 24.09.2015 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 24.09.2022 | ||
LU | 24.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 24.10.2022 | ||
GB | 24.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 24.09.2022 | ||
LU | 24.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 24.10.2022 | ||
GB | 24.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 24.09.2022 | ||
LU | 24.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 24.10.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 24.09.2022 | ||
LU | 24.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 24.10.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 24.09.2022 | ||
LU | 24.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 24.10.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 24.09.2022 | ||
LU | 24.09.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
LU | 24.09.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 24.08.2022 | |
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015101218 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH [CN]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2015113398 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2922360 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0103] - [0110] - [ 191] , [ 192] *; | EP3091803 [ ] (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH [CN]) [ ] * paragraphs [0022] - [0024] - [0 29] , [0 36] , [0 69] , [0 73] , [0 74] , [0 78] , [0 82] , [ 118] *; | EP3101969 [ ] (ZTE CORP [CN]) [ ] * the whole document *; | [A] - PANASONIC, "Support of SPS for D2D", vol. RAN WG2, no. Dresden, Germany; 20140818 - 20140822, (20140817), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-143304 SUPPORT OF SPS FOR D2D, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20140817), XP050794365 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN102300156 (ZTE CORP.) [A] 1-53 * , the whole document *; | [Y]CN104768206 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) [Y] 1-53 * , description, paragraphs 41-43, 51-61, 97-100 and 112-166, and figures 1-13 *; | [Y]CN104811892 (ZTE CORP) [Y] 1-53 * , claims 22-23, description, paragraphs 3-6 and 259-267, and figures 4 and 18 *; | [A]CN105101430 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-53* , the whole document * |