08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
10.04.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.05.2020 [2020/20] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
10.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
03.05.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.02.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.01.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
28.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.01.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.11.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.09.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.06.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.05.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
04.05.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
03.05.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.04.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.04.2018 |
First examination report |
|
12.01.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.01.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
05.01.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
05.01.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
26.05.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
04.01.2017 |
Change - representative |
|