Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3184697 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2019 | B1 | EP3184697 | 28.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITUB20159485 | 24.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2744560T | 25.02.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITUB20159485 | 24.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITUB20159485 | 24.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITUB20159485 | 24.12.2015 |