Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3040685
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.04.2021 |
Refusal of application |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
21.12.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
09.10.2020 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
02.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2020 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
16.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.12.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.07.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.12.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.12.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.11.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.07.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.06.2016 |
First examination report |
|
03.06.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
03.06.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
02.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2016 |
Change - representative |
|