EP3069777 - METHOD FOR GAS CHROMATOGRAPHIC SEPARATION OF AN ENANTIOMER MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZHAW Zurich University for Applied Sciences Einsiedlerstrasse 31 8820 Wädenswil / CH | [2016/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPENGER, Benjamin Im Staubeweidli 5 8820 Wädenswil / CH | 02 /
STOHNER, Jürgen Seestrasse 256 8810 Horgen / CH | [2016/38] | Representative(s) | Schmauder & Partner AG Patent- & Markenanwälte VSP Zwängiweg 7 8038 Zürich / CH | [2016/38] | Application number, filing date | 16160863.3 | 17.03.2016 | [2016/38] | Priority number, date | CH20150000374 | 17.03.2015 Original published format: CH 3742015 | [2016/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3069777 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3069777 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/02, B01D53/04, B01J20/29, C07B57/00, B01J20/14, B01J20/32 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
B01D53/025 (EP);
B01D53/0423 (EP);
B01J20/14 (EP);
B01J20/29 (EP);
B01J20/3204 (EP);
B01J20/3248 (EP);
C07B57/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/38] | B01D53/02, B01D53/04, B01J20/29, C07B57/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] |
Former [2016/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GASCHROMATOGRAPHISCHEN TRENNUNG EINES ENANTIOMERENGEMISCHES | [2016/38] | English: | METHOD FOR GAS CHROMATOGRAPHIC SEPARATION OF AN ENANTIOMER MIXTURE | [2016/38] | French: | PROCEDE DE SEPARATION PAR CHROMATOGRAPHIE EN PHASE GAZEUSE D'UN MELANGE D'ENANTIOMERES | [2016/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 14.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 17.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 17.12.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 17.12.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 17.07.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 17.07.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.09.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 17.07.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 17.07.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.08.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 17.07.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 17.07.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.08.2017 | Decision despatched | 17.07.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 17.07.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.08.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2016 | AL | 22.12.2021 | CY | 22.12.2021 | CZ | 22.12.2021 | DK | 22.12.2021 | EE | 22.12.2021 | ES | 22.12.2021 | FI | 22.12.2021 | HR | 22.12.2021 | IT | 22.12.2021 | LT | 22.12.2021 | LV | 22.12.2021 | MC | 22.12.2021 | NL | 22.12.2021 | PL | 22.12.2021 | RO | 22.12.2021 | RS | 22.12.2021 | SE | 22.12.2021 | SI | 22.12.2021 | SK | 22.12.2021 | SM | 22.12.2021 | AT | 17.03.2022 | IE | 17.03.2022 | LU | 17.03.2022 | BG | 22.03.2022 | GB | 22.03.2022 | NO | 22.03.2022 | GR | 23.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | FR | 31.03.2022 | IS | 22.04.2022 | PT | 22.04.2022 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 17.03.2016 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 17.03.2022 | ||
LU | 17.03.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 17.03.2022 | ||
LU | 17.03.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.03.2022 | ||
LU | 17.03.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.03.2022 | ||
LU | 17.03.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.03.2022 | ||
LU | 17.03.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | CZ | 22.12.2021 | |
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | CZ | 22.12.2021 | |
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | CZ | 22.12.2021 | |
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | CZ | 22.12.2021 | |
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 22.12.2021 | |
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 22.12.2021 | |
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 22.12.2021 | |
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 22.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE4317139 (SCHURIG VOLKER PROF DR [DE]) [AD] 1-4 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 9 * * column 2, line 41 - line 55 * * claim - *; | [I]JP2000329756 (HASEGAWA T CO LTD) [I] 1-4 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011]; claim - *; | [I]JP2005031091 (HASEGAWA T CO LTD) [I] 1-4 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012]; claim - *; | [A]EP0407412 (MACHEREY NAGEL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 30 *; | [A] - SCHURIG V, "Separation of enantiomers by gas chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL, (20010112), vol. 906, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0021-9673(00)00505-7, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 275 - 299, XP004227666 [A] 1-4 * Absatz 3.3 insbesondere Seiten 281-283 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(00)00505-7 | [AD] - MISCHNICK-LUBBECKE P ET AL, "Characterization of cyclomalto-hexaose and -heptaose derivatives by the reductive-cleavage method", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 187, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0008-6215(89)80003-5, ISSN 0008-6215, (19890415), pages 197 - 202, (19890415), XP026606742 [AD] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0008-6215(89)80003-5 | by applicant | DE4317139 | US5198429 | - Z. JIANG; J. CRASSOUS; V. SCHURIG, "Gas-chromatographic separation of tri(hetero)halogenomethane enantiomers", CHIRALITY, (2005), vol. 17, no. 8, pages 488 - 93 | - V. SCHURIG; H. GROSENICK, "Preparative enantiomer separation of enflurane and isoflurane by inclusion gas chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (1994), vol. 666, no. 1-2, doi:doi:10.1016/0021-9673(94)80422-2, pages 617 - 625, XP026571144 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9673(94)80422-2 | - W. LI; H. L. JIN; D. W. ARMSTRONG, "2,6-Di-O-pentyl-3-O-trifluoroacetyl cyclodextrin liquid stationary phases for capillary gas chromatographic separation of enantiomers", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (1990), vol. 509, no. 2, pages 303 - 324 | - D. WISTUBA; V. SCHURIG, "Enantio- and regioselectivity in the epoxidehydrolase-catalyzed ring opening of simple aliphatic oxiranes: Part I: Monoalkylsubstituted oxiranes", CHIRALITY, (1992), vol. 4, pages 175 - 184 | - P. MISCHNICK-LÜBBECKE; RALPH KREBBER, CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1989), vol. 187, pages 197 - 202 |