10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
05.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
22.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
22.03.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
08.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
13.04.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] |
09.04.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.04.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.04.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
05.03.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.02.2018 |
Change - German title |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
02.02.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
16.06.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
16.06.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] |
16.06.2017 |
Change - designated states |
published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] |
15.06.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.12.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.02.2017 [2017/05] |
14.06.2016 |
Change - representative |
|