Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10381868 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2019 | B2 | US2017033600 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20150106911 | 28.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101727390B | Global Dossier | 26.04.2017 | B1 | KR20170013783 | 07.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20150106911 | 28.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6360111B | Global Dossier | 18.07.2018 | B2 | JP2017034988 | 09.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20150106911 | 28.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106405216 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20150106911 | 28.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3124918 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2018 | B1 | EP3124918 | 01.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20150106911 | 28.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2678076T | 08.08.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | KR20150106911 | 28.07.2015 |