EP3190126 - USE OF INTERLEUKIN-4 RECEPTOR (IL-4R) ANTIBODIES AND COMPOSITIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immunex Corporation One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | [2017/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORRIS, Arvia E 4535 Thackeray Place NE Seattle, WA 98105 / US | 02 /
PLUENNEKE, John D. 5816 Hickory Place Parkville, MO 64152 / US | 03 /
ARMITAGE, Richard J 5840 Parkard Lane Bainbridge Island, WA 98110 / US | 04 /
ESCOBAR, Jose Carlos 1707 East Beaverlake Drive SE Sammarnish, WA 98075 / US | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | Care, Alison, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16192152.3 | 25.05.2001 | [2017/28] | Priority number, date | US20000579808 | 26.05.2000 Original published format: US 579808 | US20000665343 | 19.09.2000 Original published format: US 665343 | US20010785934 | 15.02.2001 Original published format: US 785934 | US20010847816 | 01.05.2001 Original published format: US 847816 | [2017/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3190126 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P19/02, A61P31/04, A61K38/17 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
C07K16/2866 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07K14/7155 (EP,US);
C07K16/28 (US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2018/08] |
Former [2017/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON INTERLEUKIN-4 REZEPTOR (IL-4R) ANTIKÖRPERN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAVON | [2017/28] | English: | USE OF INTERLEUKIN-4 RECEPTOR (IL-4R) ANTIBODIES AND COMPOSITIONS THEREOF | [2017/28] | French: | UTILISATION D'ANTICORPS CONTRE LE RECEPTEUR D'INTERLEUKINE-4 (IL-4R) ET COMPOSITIONS CORRESPONDANTES | [2017/28] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 14.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2019 | Observations by third parties | 10.05.2019 | Observations by third parties | 25.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2020 | Observations by third parties | 04.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2021 | Observations by third parties | 02.11.2021 | Observations by third parties | 22.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2023 | Observations by third parties | 05.02.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.06.2024 | 16.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/25] | 16.02.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/25] | 04.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01952133.5 / EP1283851 | EP10185626.8 / EP2292665 | EP15168899.1 / EP2990420 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.08.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 13.08.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.08.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9109059 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 17, line 12 - page 18, line 3; example -; claim - * * example - * * claim - *; | [A]EP0604693 (SCHERING PLOUGH CORP [FR]) [A] 1-8 * claim - *; | [A]WO9421282 (IMMUNEX CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * example -; claim - * * claim - *; | [A]WO9633735 (CELL GENESYS INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 15, line 9 - line 11; claims 1, 19, 20, 26, 27 * * claims 1,19,20,26,27 *; | [A]WO9634096 (CELL GENESYS INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 14, line 16 - line 18; claims 1, 17, 18, 24, 25 * * claims 1,17,18,24,25 *; | [A]WO0018932 (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 21-23; examples 10-13 ** figures 21-23 *; | [A] - S. ZURAWSKI ET AL., "The primary binding subunit of the human interleukin-4 receptor is also a component of the interleukin-13 receptor.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, Baltimore, MD, USA, (19950609), vol. 270, no. 23, pages 13869 - 13878, XP000986235 [A] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.23.13869 | [A] - O. HULTGREN ET AL., "Staphylococcus aureus-induced septic arthritis and septic death is decreased in IL-4-deficient mice: role of IL-4 as promoter for bacterial growth.", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, Baltimore, MD, USA, (19980515), vol. 160, no. 10, pages 5082 - 5087, XP002189479 [A] 1-8 * abstract * | by applicant | US4518584 | US4737462 | US4751180 | US4935233 | US4946778 | WO9103553 | US5011912 | US5017691 | WO9109059 | US5041381 | EP0464533 | WO9310151 | WO9318047 | WO9410308 | US5350683 | US5457035 | WO9611213 | US5510259 | US5545806 | WO9629408 | US5569825 | US5599905 | US5676940 | US5710023 | US5723118 | US5770429 | US5789237 | US5814318 | US5863537 | US5928904 | US5962269 | US6028176 | US6033688 | - YOKOTA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1986), vol. 83, page 5894 | - NOMA ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 319, page 640 | - GRABSTEIN ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1986), vol. 163, page 1405 | - MOSIEY ET AL., CELL, (19891020), vol. 59, pages 335 - 348 | - IDZERDA ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (199003), vol. 171, pages 861 - 873 | - SATO ET AL., CURRENT OPINION IN CELL BIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 6, pages 174 - 179 | - ZURAWSKI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, no. 23, page 13869 | - DE VRIES, J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL, (199808), vol. 102, no. 2, page 165 | - CALLARD ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (199603), vol. 17, no. 3, page 108 | - YOUAKIM, A; M. AHDIEH, AM. J. PHYSIOL., vol. 276 | - GASTROINTEST. LIVERPHYSIOL., (1999), vol. 39, pages G1279 - G1288 | - MOSLEY ET AL., CELL, (19891020), vol. 59, pages 335 - 348 | - IDZERDA ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (199003), vol. 171, page 861 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482 | - GRIBSKOV AND BURGESS, NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 14, page 6745 | - SCHWARTZ AND DAYHOFF,, Atlas of Protein Sequence and Structure, NATIONAL BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION, (1979), pages 353 - 358 | - WALDER ET AL., GENE, (1986), vol. 42, page 133 | - BAUER ET AL., GENE, (1985), vol. 37, page 73 | - BIOTECHNIQUES, (198501), pages 12 - 19 | - HOPP ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, page 1204 | - ASHKENAZI ET AL., PNAS USA, (1991), vol. 88, page 10535 | - BYRN ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 344, page 677 | - HOLLENBAUGH; ARUFFO, "Construction of Immunoglobulin Fusion Proteins", CURRENT PROTOCOLS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (1992), pages 10.19.1 - 10.19.11 | - BAUM ET AL., EMBO J., (1994), vol. 13, pages 3992 - 4001 | - LANDSCHULZ ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, no. 1759 | - HOPPE ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1994), vol. 344, page 191 | - FANSLOW ET AL., SEMIN. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 6, pages 267 - 278 | - TAKESHITA ET AL., SCIENCE, (19920717), vol. 257, page 379 | - PARK ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 1669 - 673 | - GLUZMAN ET AL., CELL, (1981), vol. 23, page 175 | - MCMAHAN ET AL., EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, page 2821 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, page 323 | - LIU ET AL., PNAS, (1987), vol. 84, page 3439 | - LARRICK ET AL., BIOFTECHNOLOGY, (1989), vol. 7, page 934 | - WINTER; HARRIS, TIPS, (199305), vol. 14, page 139 | - KORTT ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1997), vol. 10, page 423 | - BIRD, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, page 423 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 5879 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 334, page 544 | - FITCH ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 107, no. 2, page S61 | - MULLER ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 237, pages 423 - 436 | - PARK ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1987), vol. 166, page 476 | - PRESTA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, no. 5, pages 2623 - 2632 | - ADELROTH ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL, (2000), vol. 106, no. 2, pages 253 - 259 | - ZUND ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, no. 13, pages 7460 - 7464 | - MARCU ET AL., CELL, (1980), vol. 22, page 187 | - MARSH ET AL., GENE, (1984), vol. 32, pages 481 - 485 | - ADRA ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 60, pages 65 - 74 | - BOER ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL GENETICS, (1990), vol. 28, pages 299 - 308 | - TYBULEWICZ ET AL., CELL, (1991), vol. 65, pages 1153 - 1163 | - MANSOUR ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 336, pages 348 - 352 | - MCMAHON, A. P.; BRADLEY, A., CELL, (1990), vol. 62, pages 1073 - 1085 | - E. J. ROBERTSON,, Teratocarcinomas and Embryonic Stem Cells: a Practical Approach, IRL PRESS, (1987), pages 71 - 112 | - HASTY ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 350, pages 243 - 246 | - LAIRD ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1991), vol. 19, page 4293 | - A. BRADLEY, Teratocarcinomas and Embryonic Stem Cells: a Practical Approach, IRL PRESS, (1987), pages 113 - 151 | - CHEN ET AL., IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 5, pages 647 - 656 | - TAYLOR ET AL., INT. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 6, pages 579 - 591 | - TAYLOR ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, pages 6287 - 6295 | - CHEN ET AL., EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, pages 811 - 820 | - FISHWILD ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, pages 845 - 851 | - OI; HERTZENBERG, "Immunoglobulin Producing Hybrid Cell Lines", OI; HERTZENBERG, MISHELL AND SHIIGI,, Selected Methods In Cellular Immunology, FREEMAN, (1980), pages 357 - 372 | - MORRIS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 418 - 423 | - MADARA, J.; K. DHARMSATHAPHORN, J. CELL BIOL., (1985), vol. 101, pages 2124 - 2133 | - MADARA, J.; J. STAFFORD, J. CLIN. INVEST., (1989), vol. 83, pages 724 - 727 | - YOUAKIM, A.; M. AHDIEH, AM. J. PHYSIOL., vol. 276 | - GASTROINTEST. LIVER PHYSIOL., (1999), vol. 39, pages G1279 - G1288 | - ELLISON ET AL., DNA, (1981), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 11 - 18 | other | EP2990420 | WO9633735 | WO9634096 | - "Epitope Mapping", Ed Harlow and David Lane, Antibodies, A Laboratory Manual, Cold Spring Harbor Laboratory Press, (19980000), page 590, XP055586163 | - Ganesh N Sivalingam; Adrian J Shepherd, "An analysis of beta-cell epitope discontinuity", Molecular Immunology, vol. 51, no. 3-4, pages 304 - 309, XP028503029 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molimm.2012.03.030 | - ZURAWSKI et al., "The primary binding subunit of the human interleukin-4 receptor is also a component of the interleukin-13 receptor", J. Biol. Chem., (19950000), vol. 270, doi:10.1074/jbc.270.23.13869, pages 13869 - 13878, XP002010894 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.23.13869 | - Keegan A. D., "IL-4 Receptor", Cytokine Reference, Academic Press, (20000101), pages 1471 - 1480, XP093079229 |