EP3168020 - RECYCLABLE COLORANTS IN PLASTIC BEVERAGE CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pepsico, Inc. 700 Anderson Hill Road Purchase, NY 10577 / US | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Wei 111 S. Broadway White Plains, NY 10605 / US | 02 /
NICHOLSON, Lee M. 39 Huntville Road Katonah, NY 10536 / US | 03 /
SCHLOSS, Frank Plastic Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 43528-0964 1440 Timberwolf Drive Holland, OH Ohio 10577 / US | 04 /
HASLOW, Jason Plastic Technologies, Inc. 1440 Timberwolf Drive Holland, OH Ohio 43528-0964 / US | [2017/24] |
Former [2017/20] | 01 /
LIU, Wei PepsiCo, Inc. 700 Anderson Hill Road Purchase, NY New York 10577 / US | ||
02 /
NICHOLSON, Lee M. PepsiCo, Inc. 700 Anderson Hill Road Purchase, NV Nevada 10577 / US | |||
03 /
SCHLOSS, Frank Plastic Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 43528-0964 1440 Timberwolf Drive Holland, OH Ohio 10577 / US | |||
04 /
HASLOW, Jason Plastic Technologies, Inc. 1440 Timberwolf Drive Holland, OH Ohio 43528-0964 / US | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16203261.9 | 14.09.2012 | [2017/20] | Priority number, date | US201113234909 | 16.09.2011 Original published format: US201113234909 | [2017/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3168020 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B29B11/06, C08J3/20, C08K5/092 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08J3/226 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US);
C08J2467/02 (EP,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1303 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1359 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L67/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Title | German: | WIEDERVERWENDBARE FARBSTOFFE BEI KUNSTSTOFFGETRÄNKEBEHÄLTERN | [2017/20] | English: | RECYCLABLE COLORANTS IN PLASTIC BEVERAGE CONTAINERS | [2017/20] | French: | COLORANTS RECYCLABLES DANS DES CONTENEURS POUR BOISSON EN MATIÈRE PLASTIQUE | [2017/20] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 09.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 14.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12768959.4 / EP2756030 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2224504 (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD [JP]); | [A]JPH11226944 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [XI]JP2006056518 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD); | by applicant | US5504421 |