Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3168020
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
16.10.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
13.07.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.02.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.08.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.04.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.12.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.09.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.08.2018 |
First examination report |
|
14.11.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.05.2017 |
Change - inventor |
published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] |
18.04.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
18.04.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
18.04.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
25.03.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
13.12.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.12.2016 |
Change - representative |
|