Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5986208B | Global Dossier | 06.09.2016 | B2 | JP2014527117 | 09.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US55328 | 14.09.2012 | US201113234909 | 16.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2756030 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2016 | B1 | EP2756030 | 23.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US55328 | 14.09.2012 | US201113234909 | 16.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103890052B | Global Dossier | 06.07.2016 | B | CN103890052 | 25.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US55328 | 14.09.2012 | US201113234909 | 16.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3168020 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12768959 | 14.09.2012 | US201113234909 | 16.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2618462T | 21.06.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US55328 | 14.09.2012 | US201113234909 | 16.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2756030T | 31.07.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12768959 | 14.09.2012 | US201113234909 | 16.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013040304 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113234909 | 16.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8722163 | Global Dossier | 13.05.2014 | B2 | US2013071592 | 21.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113234909 | 16.09.2011 | Type | Earlier application | EP2756030 |